Jackson #748757 v. Lewis
Plaintiff: Douglas Cornell Jackson #748757
Defendant: Patricia Lewis
Case Number: 2:2020cv00148
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Paul L Maloney
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying #17 motion for order for immediate medical care; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat, rbk)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying #15 motion for recusal ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat, rbk)
October 14, 2020 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Douglas Cornell Jackson #748757 re MOTION for order for immediate medical care #17 (slk)
October 14, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for order for immediate medical care by plaintiff Douglas Cornell Jackson #748757; (slk)
October 14, 2020 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Douglas Cornell Jackson #748757 re MOTION for recusal of Judge Vermaat #15 (slk)
October 14, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for recusal of Judge Vermaat by plaintiff Douglas Cornell Jackson #748757; (slk)
October 9, 2020 Copy of Order on Motion for Hearing, Order on Motion to Transfer to New Facility #14 sent via U.S. Mail to Douglas Cornell Jackson (slk)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #11 motion for hearing; denying #11 motion to transfer to new facility ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat, rbk)
October 8, 2020 Filing 13 LETTER from plaintiff Douglas Cornell Jackson #748757 requesting docket sheet; mailed docket sheet to plaintiff (mlc)
October 8, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Douglas Cornell Jackson #748757 re MOTION for hearing named as, "motion for in court proceedings" MOTION to transfer to new facility #11 (mlc)
October 8, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for hearing named as, "motion for in court proceedings", MOTION to transfer to new facility by plaintiff Douglas Cornell Jackson #748757; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1) (mlc)
October 2, 2020 Copy of Notice of Hearing #10 sent via U.S. Mail to Douglas Cornell Jackson (slk)
October 2, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of telephone status conference, using the Court's conference line, set for 10/20/2020 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; (cam)
October 1, 2020 NOTICE OF LAWSUIT/REQUEST FOR WAIVER of service delivered to USM as to defendant Patricia Lewis (slk)
October 1, 2020 Copy of Order Removing Case from Early Mediation #6 , Order Regarding Service - Prisoner #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Douglas Cornell Jackson (slk)
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Patricia Lewis for her First Request for Production of Documents and Notice of Subpoena to Michigan Department of Corrections (Suleiman, Wedad)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 DEMAND for TRIAL BY JURY by defendant Patricia Lewis (Suleiman, Wedad)
October 1, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Wedad Suleiman on behalf of defendant Patricia Lewis (Suleiman, Wedad)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER LIFTING STAY and REGARDING SERVICE: the Clerk is to arrange for service of this order and the complaint upon the defendants ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REMOVING CASE FROM EARLY MEDIATION re #5 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (lep)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 STATEMENT from defendant Patricia Lewis seeking exclusion from the prisoner civil rights litigation early mediation program with proof of service (Suleiman, Wedad) Modified text on 9/30/2020 (slk).
September 29, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) LIMITED ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Wedad Suleiman on behalf of defendant Patricia Lewis for purposes of the Prisoner Civil Rights Litigation Early Mediation Program (Suleiman, Wedad)
September 23, 2020 Copy of Order Staying Case and Referring to Early Mediation Program, #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Douglas Cornell Jackson (slk)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER STAYING CASE and referring to EARLY MEDIATION: case is stayed for 120 days to allow parties to participate in mediation; collection of the filing fee is suspended; the 90-day period for service is tolled; the MI Attorney General shall enter a limited appearance by October 14, 2020; w/attached Protocol ; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (lep)
September 4, 2020 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Without Payment of Initial Fee - Prisoner, #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Douglas Cornell Jackson (mlc)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff may proceed in forma pauperis without payment of an initial partial filing fee; plaintiff to remain liable for the filing fee as funds become available ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Douglas Cornell Jackson #748757; (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (slk)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against Patricia Lewis filed by Douglas Cornell Jackson #748757 (slk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson #748757 v. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Cornell Jackson #748757
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Lewis
Represented By: Wedad Suleiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?