Bagley #885214 v. Jamros
Plaintiff: Keith Bagley #885214
Defendant: Wendy Jamros
Case Number: 2:2020cv00150
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Northern Division (2) Office
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) LIMITED ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Wedad Suleiman on behalf of defendant Wendy Jamros for purposes of the Prisoner Civil Rights Litigation Early Mediation Program (Suleiman, Wedad)
October 9, 2020 Copy of Order Staying Case and Referring to Early Mediation Program, #9 sent via U.S. Mail to Keith Bagley (slk)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER STAYING CASE and referring to EARLY MEDIATION: case is stayed for 120 days to allow parties to participate in mediation; collection of the filing fee is suspended; the 90-day period for service is tolled; the MI Attorney General shall enter a limited appearance by October 30, 2020; w/attached Protocol ; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (lep)
October 9, 2020 Copy of Order on Motion for Reconsideration, #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Keith Bagley (mlc)
October 8, 2020 Filing 8 EXHIBIT re #1 (Filed per Order #7 ) by plaintiff Keith Bagley #885214 (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B, #3 Attachment C, #4 Attachment D, #5 Attachment E) (mlc)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 motion for reconsideration. The judgment entered on 9/9/2020, is VACATED. Plaintiff's motion to amend the complaint #6 is GRANTED. The Court will consider the attachments to Plaintiff's motion [6-1 to 6-6] as if they are exhibits to the complaint ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
October 6, 2020 RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment in the amount of $138.00, receipt number MQ006155; amount paid to date $138.00 (slk)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for reconsideration re #5 , #4 or in the alternative, leave to amend by plaintiff Keith Bagley #885214; (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Keith Bagley, #2 Attachment A, #3 Attachment B, #4 Attachment C, #5 Attachment D, #6 Attachment E) (slk)
September 9, 2020 Certified Copy of Opinion (Screening) #4 , Judgment - Frivolous, Malicious, or for Failure to State a Claim (Prisoner Civil Rights Case) #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Keith Bagley (slk)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (VACATED by Order #7 ) JUDGMENT that the action is dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) Modified text on 10/9/2020 (mlc).
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 OPINION ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
August 21, 2020 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due When Funds Are Available - Prisoner, #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Keith Bagley (mlc)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff to pay an initial partial fee of $52.00 when funds are available; plaintiff to make interim payments until the full fee is paid ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Keith Bagley #885214; (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (mlc)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against Wendy Jamros filed by Keith Bagley #885214 (Attachments: #1 Miscellaneous Attachments) (mlc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bagley #885214 v. Jamros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Jamros
Represented By: Wedad Suleiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Bagley #885214
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?