Wilson #194476 v. Horton et al
Petitioner: Victor L. Wilson #194476
Respondent: Connie Horton and Heidi Washington
Case Number: 2:2020cv00152
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Northern Division (2) Office
Presiding Judge: Janet T Neff
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 11 LETTER FROM CCA regarding appeal #7 indicating a status update. (slk)
September 21, 2020 Copy of Deficiency Order (Appeal) #10 sent via U.S. Mail to Victor L. Wilson (mlc)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DEFICIENCY ORDER regarding APPEAL: plaintiff/petitioner has failed to pay the appeal fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
September 14, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER FROM CCA regarding appeal #7 indicating that the appeal has been filed as case 20-1883 and regarding filing fee and certificate of appealability (slk)
September 14, 2020 CASE NUMBER 20-1883 assigned by the Sixth Circuit to appeal #7 (mkc)
September 14, 2020 Copy of Notice of Appeal #8 with docket sheet sent via U.S. Mail to Victor L. Wilson (mlc)
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEAL re #5 , #6 , #4 by petitioner Victor L. Wilson #194476 (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (mlc) Modified text on 9/16/2020; this Notice of Appeal is duplicative of #7 and will not be opened as a new appeal per email from the USCA (mlc).
September 10, 2020 Copy of Notice of Appeal #7 with docket sheet sent via U.S. Mail to Victor L. Wilson (mlc)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEAL re #5 , #6 , #4 by petitioner Victor L. Wilson #194476 (mlc)
August 28, 2020 Certified Copy of Order Denying Certificate of Appealability #5 , Opinion (Screening) #4 , Judgment Dismissing Habeas Action Under Rule 4 #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Victor L. Wilson (mlc)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 JUDGMENT dismissing without prejudice habeas action under Rule 4; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying certificate of appealability; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION; Order and Judgment to issue; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
August 24, 2020 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP (Habeas) #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Victor L. Wilson (mlc)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting petitioner leave to proceed in forma pauperis in a habeas action ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by petitioner Victor L. Wilson #194476; (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (mlc)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus named as, "Emergency Writ of Habeas Corpus or Emergency Application for a Temporary Restraining Order Preventive Preliminary Injunction" filed by Victor L. Wilson #194476 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (mlc) Modified text on 8/21/2020 (mlc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson #194476 v. Horton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Connie Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Heidi Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Victor L. Wilson #194476
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?