Hurdman v. Lake Superior & Ishpeming Railroad Company
Plaintiff: William John Hurdman and William J. Hurdman
Defendant: Lake Superior & Ishpeming Railroad Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00216
Filed: October 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Janet T Neff
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 5/31/2022; dispositive motions due by 6/27/2022; ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
December 17, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of telephone status conference set for 3/9/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; (cam)
December 17, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTES of Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone held before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (Proceedings Not Recorded) (cam)
December 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE to attorney Alan Fisher regarding recent filing #1 , #9 (slk)
December 8, 2020 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Fisher, Alan)
December 8, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed; Lake Superior & Ishpeming Railroad Company served on 11/5/2020, answer due 11/30/2020 (Fisher, Alan)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER regarding dispositive motions ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference, using the Court's conference line, set for 12/17/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; status report due by 12/14/2020 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
November 24, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lake Superior & Ishpeming Railroad Company identifying Corporate Parent Cleveland Cliffs, Inc. for Lake Superior & Ishpeming Railroad Company (McLeod, Peter)
November 24, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Lake Superior & Ishpeming Railroad Company (McLeod, Peter)
November 24, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Peter Colin McLeod on behalf of defendant Lake Superior & Ishpeming Railroad Company (McLeod, Peter)
October 21, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Lake Superior & Ishpeming Railroad Company (slk)
October 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (slk)
October 20, 2020 RECEIPT: in the amount of $400.00, receipt number AMIWDC-5830245; filing fee paid by attorney Alan Jon Fisher on behalf of plaintiff William John Hurdman (jmw)
October 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Lake Superior & Ishpeming Railroad Company filed by William John Hurdman (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Proposed Summons) (Fisher, Alan) Modified text on 10/21/2020 (slk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurdman v. Lake Superior & Ishpeming Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William John Hurdman
Represented By: Alan Jon Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J. Hurdman
Represented By: Alan Jon Fisher
Represented By: Craig Wynn Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Superior & Ishpeming Railroad Company
Represented By: Peter Colin McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?