Jackson #748757 v. Pynnonen et al
Plaintiff: Douglas Cornell Jackson #748757
Defendant: Unknown Pynnonen, Kyle Larson, Patricia Lewis, Dawn Coon, Nathan Hoffman, Unknown Borgen and Chet Dums
Case Number: 2:2021cv00026
Filed: February 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Certified Copy of Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion for Writ of Mandamus #16 , Judgment Dismissing Case #17 sent via U.S. Mail to Douglas Cornell Jackson (slk)
March 31, 2021 Filing 17 JUDGMENT dismissing case without prejudice ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying #6 motion for reconsideration ; denying #12 motion for writ of mandamus; the Court discerns no good-faith basis for appeal ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
March 26, 2021 Filing 15 LETTER from plaintiff Douglas Cornell Jackson #748757 requesting docket sheet; mailed docket sheet to plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Response from Clerk Memo) (mlc)
March 23, 2021 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Douglas Cornell Jackson #748757 re MOTION for writ of mandamus #12 , Brief in Support of a Motion #13 (slk)
March 23, 2021 Filing 13 BRIEF in support of MOTION for writ of mandamus #12 filed by Douglas Cornell Jackson #748757 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Legal Writer's Program, #2 Exhibit 1 - Miscellaneous Attachments) (slk)
March 23, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for writ of mandamus by plaintiff Douglas Cornell Jackson #748757; (slk)
March 17, 2021 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Douglas Cornell Jackson #748757 re Letter to Court #10 (slk)
March 17, 2021 Filing 10 LETTER from plaintiff Douglas Cornell Jackson #748757 regarding explaining evidence (Attachments: #1 evidence in homemade envelope) (slk)
March 10, 2021 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Douglas Cornell Jackson #748757 re Affidavit #8 (slk)
March 10, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT re #1 by plaintiff Douglas Cornell Jackson #748757 (slk)
March 1, 2021 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Douglas Cornell Jackson #748757 re MOTION for reconsideration re #4 , #3 #6 (mlc)
March 1, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for reconsideration re #4 , #3 by plaintiff Douglas Cornell Jackson #748757; (mlc)
February 25, 2021 Filing 5 LETTER from plaintiff Douglas Cornell Jackson #748757 requesting docket sheet; mailed docket sheet to plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Response from Clerk Memo) (mlc)
February 18, 2021 Copy of Order Denying IFP - Three Strikes - Prisoner #4 , Opinion (Screening) #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Douglas Cornell Jackson (mlc)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING IFP UNDER THREE STRIKES RULE: plaintiff to pay the entire fee of $402.00 within 28 days or the case will be dismissed ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
February 17, 2021 Filing 3 OPINION ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
February 1, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Douglas Cornell Jackson #748757; (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (slk)
February 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against All Defendants filed by Douglas Cornell Jackson #748757 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support) (slk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson #748757 v. Pynnonen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Pynnonen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Coon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Borgen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chet Dums
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Cornell Jackson #748757
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?