Brown #408842 v. Bott et al
Plaintiff: Jason Alan Brown #408842
Defendant: Unknown Party #2, Erica Huss, Unknown Allen, Dana Bott, Unknown VanAcker, Unknown Party #1, Unknown Baldini and W. Torongo
Case Number: 2:2021cv00056
Filed: March 24, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Paul L Maloney
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LETTER from plaintiff Jason Alan Brown #408842 regarding appeal forms; mailed (3) Notice of Appeal forms to plaintiff (mlc)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 JUDGMENT that the action is dismissed as frivolous, malicious, or for failure to state a claim; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 OPINION; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Certified Copy of Opinion (Screening) #6 , Judgment - Frivolous, Malicious, or for Failure to State a Claim (Prisoner Civil Rights Case) #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Jason Alan Brown (mlc)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LETTER from plaintiff Jason Alan Brown #408842 regarding asking the court to include his jury demand as taken from his complaint. Jury Demand for Plaintiff added to the case. (slk)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff to pay an initial partial fee of $2.74 within 28 days; plaintiff to make interim payments until the full fee is paid;( initial partial filing fee to be submitted by 4/23/2021) ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due in 28 Days - Prisoner, #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Jason Alan Brown (slk)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LETTER from plaintiff Jason Alan Brown #408842 regarding John Doe #1 has been identified as Sgt. W. Torongo (mailed docket sheet to plaintiff to reference name change on the docket) (mlc)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Jason Alan Brown #408842; (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (mlc)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against All Defendants filed by Jason Alan Brown #408842 (mlc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown #408842 v. Bott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica Huss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Bott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown VanAcker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Baldini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Torongo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Alan Brown #408842
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?