Hardrick #606507 v. Hares et al
Plaintiff: Bernard Hardrick #606507
Defendant: Unknown Green, Erica Huss, Unknown Holdwick, Mark Hares and Thomas Osier
Case Number: 2:2021cv00064
Filed: April 1, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Paul L Maloney
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants Mark Hares, Unknown Holdwick re Attorney Appearance (Limited) (Korbakis, Raina)
May 24, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) LIMITED ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Raina Korbakis on behalf of defendants Mark Hares, Unknown Holdwick for purposes of the Prisoner Civil Rights Litigation Early Mediation Program (Korbakis, Raina)
May 20, 2021 Copy of Order Rejecting Pleading #8 with original documents sent via U.S. Mail to Bernard Hardrick #606507 (jmw)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REJECTING Motion for Physical Examination submitted by Bernard Hardrick ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (Attachments: #1 Rejected Document) (cam)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REJECTING Motion for Reconsideration submitted by Bernard Hardrick ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (Attachments: #1 Rejected Document) (cam)
May 7, 2021 Copy of Order Rejecting Pleading #7 with rejected documents sent via U.S. Mail to Bernard Hardrick (mlc)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER STAYING CASE and referring to EARLY MEDIATION: case is stayed for 120 days to allow parties to participate in mediation; collection of the filing fee is suspended; the 90-day period for service is tolled; the MI Attorney General shall enter a limited appearance by May 24, 2021; w/attached Protocol ; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (mg)
May 3, 2021 Copy of Order Staying Case and Referring to Early Mediation Program, #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Bernard Hardrick (mlc)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER dismissing Thomas Osier (Asst. Mental Health Service Director), Unknown Green (CQMHP, Mental Health Personnel) and Erica Huss (Warden); signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
April 29, 2021 Filing 4 OPINION; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
April 29, 2021 Copy of Order Dismissing Party #5 , Opinion (Screening) #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Bernard Hardrick (mlc)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff to pay an initial partial fee of $6.41 when funds are available; plaintiff to make interim payments until the full fee is paid ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
April 2, 2021 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due When Funds Are Available - Prisoner, #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Bernard Hardrick #606507 (ndj)
April 1, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Bernard Hardrick #606507; (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (mlc)
April 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against All Defendants filed by Bernard Hardrick #606507 (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Appendix D) (mlc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardrick #606507 v. Hares et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Hardrick #606507
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica Huss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Holdwick
Represented By: Raina Korbakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hares
Represented By: Raina Korbakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Osier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?