Butler #424595 v. Bauman
Petitioner: Leroy Butler #424595
Respondent: Catherine Bauman
Case Number: 2:2021cv00079
Filed: April 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Janet T Neff
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2021 Filing 7 JUDGMENT dismissing with prejudice habeas action under Rule 4; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying certificate of appealability; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
June 16, 2021 Certified Copies of Order Denying Certificate of Appealability #6 , Judgment Dismissing Habeas Action Under Rule 4 #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Leroy Butler #424595 (ems) Modified text on 6/16/2021 (ems).
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER setting miscellaneous deadline: Petitioner must show cause within 28 days why the petition should not be dismissed as untimely; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION; Order to issue; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
May 6, 2021 Copy of Opinion (Screening) #4 , Order Setting Misc. Deadline - Prisoner #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Leroy Bulter #424595 (tlbu)
April 29, 2021 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP (Habeas) #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Leroy Butler (slk)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting petitioner leave to proceed in forma pauperis in a habeas action ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
April 22, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by petitioner Leroy Butler #424595; (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (slk)
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Leroy Butler #424595 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (slk) Modified filing date on 4/23/2021 (slk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler #424595 v. Bauman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Catherine Bauman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Leroy Butler #424595
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?