McGruther #842260 v. Horton
Petitioner: Joseph McGruther #842260
Respondent: Connie Horton
Case Number: 2:2021cv00094
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Paul L Maloney
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RESPONSE TO #6 filed by petitioner Joseph McGruther #842260 (mlc)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER setting miscellaneous deadline: pro se misc deadline set for 28 days to show cause; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 OPINION ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Opinion (Screening) #5 , Order Setting Misc. Deadline - Prisoner #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Joseph McGruther #842260 (ndj)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Joseph McGruther #842260 (mlc)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order RECEIPT: filing fee in the amount of $ 5.00, receipt number GR074107 (jem)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Order to File Amended Pleading on the Form #3 with amended habeas form sent via U.S. Mail to Joseph McGruther #842260 (tlbu) Modified text on 5/12/2021 (tlbu).
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the filing party to submit an amended pleading in proper form within 28 days or the action may be dismissed ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Deficiency Order, #2 sent via U.S. Mail to Joseph McGruther (mlc)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DEFICIENCY ORDER: plaintiff/petitioner has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 6/4/2021 or the action will be dismissed ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Joseph McGruther #842260 (mlc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGruther #842260 v. Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Connie Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph McGruther #842260
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?