Young #753683 v. Horton
Petitioner: DeMarcus T. Young #753683
Respondent: Connie Horton
Case Number: 2:2021cv00114
Filed: May 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Janet T Neff
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 Certified Copy of Opinion #17 , Judgment - Frivolous, Malicious, or for Failure to State a Claim (Prisoner Civil Rights Case) #19 , Order,,, #18 sent via U.S. Mail to DeMarcus T. Young #753683 (ndj)
May 28, 2021 Filing 19 JUDGMENT that the action is dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that Plaintiff's request for early release from prison will be severed from this action into a separate 2254 habeas petition with Warden Connie Horton as the Respondent. The Clerk of Court shall docket all pleadings to date, including this order, in both the new 2254 proceeding and the present civil rights action. The 1983 civil rights action shall retain the present case number. The other proceeding shall be assigned a new case number. The Court's 9/9/2020, denial of class certification and dismissal of Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claim are REAFFIRMED. Plaintiff's remaining substantive due process claim is DENIED, because it fails to state a claim on which relief can be granted; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
May 28, 2021 Filing 17 OPINION ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
May 21, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE cancelling hearing - 7/14/2021 telephone conference cancelled pending screening of the case. (cam)
May 21, 2021 Copy of Notice Cancelling Hearing #16 sent via U.S. Mail to DeMarcus T. Young #753683 (tlbu)
May 11, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of telephone status conference set for 7/14/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; (cam)
May 11, 2021 Copy of Notice of Hearing #15 sent via U.S. Mail to DeMarcus T. Young #753683 (ndj)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER of USCA (certified copy) re appeal #9 Dismissing this appeal as interlocutory and Remanding the matter to the district court for consideration of Young's unresolved claims ; no mandate to issue (slk)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS REGARDING APPEAL FEE: plaintiff may proceed in forma pauperis without payment of an initial partial appeal fee; plaintiff remains liable for the entire appeal fee amount ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
November 10, 2020 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP on Appeal - Without Payment of Initial Fee - Prisoner, #13 sent via U.S. Mail to DeMarcus T. Young (mlc)
October 26, 2020 Filing 12 PRISONER FINANCIAL DOCUMENT(S) (cure deficiency): Certificate of Prisoner Institutional/Trust Fund Account and a Six Month Trust Account Statement submitted by plaintiff DeMarcus T. Young #753683 to cure deficiency (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (slk)
October 14, 2020 Copy of Deficiency Order (Appeal) #11 sent via U.S. Mail to DeMarcus T. Young (slk)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DEFICIENCY ORDER regarding APPEAL: plaintiff/petitioner has failed to pay the appeal fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
September 25, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER FROM CCA regarding appeal #9 indicating that the appeal has been filed as case number 20-1939 and regarding the filing fee (slk)
September 25, 2020 CASE NUMBER 20-1939 assigned by the Sixth Circuit to appeal #9 (mkc)
September 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEAL re #7 , #8 by plaintiff DeMarcus T. Young #753683 (mlc)
September 24, 2020 Copy of Notice of Appeal #9 with docket sheet sent via U.S. Mail to DeMarcus T. Young (mlc)
September 10, 2020 Certified Copy of Judgment - Frivolous, Malicious, or for Failure to State a Claim (Prisoner Civil Rights Case) #8 , Opinion (Screening) #7 sent via U.S. Mail to DeMarcus T. Young (slk)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 JUDGMENT that the action is dismissed for failure to state a claim ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 OPINION ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER from plaintiff DeMarcus T. Young #753683 regarding the status of motion #2 (mailed docket sheet) (Attachments: #1 Response from Clerk Memo) (slk)
August 7, 2020 RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment in the amount of $3.12, receipt number MQ006134; amount paid to date $3.12 (slk)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff to pay an initial partial fee of $3.12 when funds are available; plaintiff to make interim payments until the full fee is paid ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
May 29, 2020 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT re MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 by plaintiff DeMarcus T. Young #753683 (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (slk)
May 29, 2020 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due When Funds Are Available - Prisoner, #5 sent via U.S. Mail to DeMarcus T. Young (mlc)
May 28, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff DeMarcus T. Young #753683; (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Authorization for the Withdrawal of Funds, #3 Exhibit 1) (slk)
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for temporary restraining order (Emergency), MOTION for preliminary injunction by plaintiff DeMarcus T. Young #753683; (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declarations of Witnesses) (slk)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against All Defendants filed by DeMarcus T. Young #753683 (Attachments: #1 Letter from Plaintiff stating that he does not wish to participate in the early mediation program, #2 Exhibit 1 - list of names) (slk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young #753683 v. Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Connie Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DeMarcus T. Young #753683
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?