Wood v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Shan Trivit Wood
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2021cv00122
Filed: June 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed by US Marshal on Commissioner of Social Security, US Attorney and US Attorney General; service upon defendant, Commissioner of Social Security complete on 6/22/2021, answer due 8/23/2021 (mlc)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
June 15, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and delivered to US Marshal for service (mlc)
June 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (mlc)
June 9, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Olinsky, Howard)
June 9, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Shan Trivit Wood; (Olinsky, Howard)
June 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Shan Trivit Wood (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Olinsky, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shan Trivit Wood
Represented By: Howard David Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?