Saturation Services, L.L.C. v. Ballard Marine Construction, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Saturation Services, L.L.C.
Defendant: Big Digger, Dry Cargo Deck Barge and Ballard Marine Construction, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00231
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Hala Y Jarbou
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2022 Filing 23 REPLY to response to motion #13 (filed per Order #21 ) filed by Ballard Marine Construction, LLC (eod)
January 3, 2022 Filing 22 REPLY to response to motion #11 (filed per Order #20 ) filed by Ballard Marine Construction, LLC (eod)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 motion for leave to file; Clerk of the Court is directed to accept document [19-1] for filing; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 motion for leave to file; Clerk of the Court is directed to accept document [18-1] for filing; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
December 30, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to file Reply Brief in Further Support of Motion to Partially Vacate Arrest Pursuant to Admiralty Rule E(4); and to Set Security & Countersecurity Pursuant to Admiralty Rule E(2), (5) & (7) by defendant Big Digger, Dry Cargo Deck Barge; (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Reply Brief in Further Support of Motion to Partially Vacate Arrest Pursuant to Admiralty Rule E(4); and to Set Security & Countersecurity Pursuant to Admiralty Rule E(2), (5), & (7)) (Jordan, Kenderick)
December 30, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to file Reply Brief in Further Support of Motion to Stay Proceedings in Favor of Arbitration Pursuant to the Federal Arbitration Act by defendant Big Digger, Dry Cargo Deck Barge; (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Reply Brief in Further Support of Motion to Stay Proceedings in Favor of Arbitration Pursuant to the Federal Arbitration Act.) (Jordan, Kenderick)
December 27, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to stay Proceedings in Favor of Arbitration Pursuant to the Federal Arbitration Act and Brief in Support #11 filed by Saturation Services, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Michael Ehlers) (Howard, William)
December 27, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to Partially Vacate Arrest #13 filed by Saturation Services, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Michael Ehlers) (Howard, William)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that responses to Motion to Vacate #13 and Motion to Stay #11 , if any, due by 12/27/2021 at 5:00 PM; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
December 17, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Big Digger, Dry Cargo Deck Barge re MOTION to Partially Vacate Arrest #13 (Jordan, Kenderick) Modified text on 12/20/2021 (eod)
December 17, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Partially Vacate Arrest Pursuant to Admiralty Rule E(4); and to Set Security & Countersecurity Pursuant to Admiralty Rule E(2), (5) &(7) with expedited consideration requested and brief in support by defendant Big Digger, Dry Cargo Deck Barge; (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Equipment Lease, #3 Exhibit 2 - Arbitration Demand, #4 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Christopher Bauer, #5 Exhibit A - June 10, 2021 Email, #6 Exhibit B - September 25, 2021 Email, #7 Exhibit C - August 11, 2021 Letter, #8 Exhibit D - October 1, 2021 Letter, #9 Exhibit E - October 14, 2021 Letter, #10 Exhibit F - Counterclaim Spreadsheet) (Jordan, Kenderick) Modified text on 12/20/2021 (eod)
December 17, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Big Digger, Dry Cargo Deck Barge re MOTION to stay Proceedings in Favor of Arbitration Pursuant to the Federal Arbitration Act and Brief in Support #11 (Jordan, Kenderick)
December 17, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to stay Proceedings in Favor of Arbitration Pursuant to the Federal Arbitration Act and Brief in Support by defendant Big Digger, Dry Cargo Deck Barge; (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Equipment Lease, #3 Exhibit 2 - Arbitration Demand, #4 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Christopher Bauer, #5 Exhibit A - June 10, 2021 Email, #6 Exhibit B - September 25, 2021 Email, #7 Exhibit C - August 11, 2021 Letter, #8 Exhibit D - October 1, 2021 Letter, #9 Exhibit E - October 14, 2021 Letter, #10 Exhibit F - Counterclaim Spreadsheet) (Jordan, Kenderick)
December 17, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Kenderick Mason Jordan on behalf of defendant Big Digger, Dry Cargo Deck Barge (Jordan, Kenderick)
December 6, 2021 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interest by defendant Big Digger, Dry Cargo Deck Barge (Friedman, Shari)
December 1, 2021 Filing 9 VERIFICATION STATEMENT of Interest by defendant Big Digger, Dry Cargo Deck Barge [Attorney Shari L. Friedman added to party Big Digger, Dry Cargo Deck Barge(pty:dft)] (Friedman, Shari) Modified text on 12/2/2021 (eod)
December 1, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Shari L. Friedman on behalf of defendant Big Digger, Dry Cargo Deck Barge (Friedman, Shari) Modified text and filers per ECF HelpDesk call on 12/1/2021 (ems).
November 15, 2021 Filing 7 PROPOSED WARRANT for arrest in rem (Howard, William) Modified text on 11/15/2021 (eod)
November 11, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Saturation Services, L.L.C. (Howard, William)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR WARRANT of arrest of property granting #2 ; the Clerk of the Court is directed to issue an arrest warrant for the vessel and property identified in Plaintiff's proposed order for issuance of warrant of arrest [2-1]; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (jep)
November 10, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Ballard Marine Construction, LLC, Big Digger, Dry Cargo Deck Barge (eod)
November 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Hala Y. Jarbou ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (eod)
November 10, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for issuance of warrant in rem by plaintiff Saturation Services, L.L.C.; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Howard, William)
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ballard Marine Construction, LLC, Big Digger Dry Cargo Deck Barge et al in rem filed by Saturation Services, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 email, #2 Exhibit 2 notice to proceed, #3 Exhibit 3 equipment lease, #4 Exhibit 4 purchase orders, #5 Exhibit 5 invoices, #6 Exhibit 6 invoices, #7 Exhibit 7 invoices, #8 Exhibit 8 invoices, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons Ballard Marine Construction, LLC, #11 Summons Big Digger) (Howard, William)
November 10, 2021 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Saturation Services, L.L.C. in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6592959 (Howard, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saturation Services, L.L.C. v. Ballard Marine Construction, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saturation Services, L.L.C.
Represented By: William D. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Digger, Dry Cargo Deck Barge
Represented By: Kenderick Mason Jordan
Represented By: Shari L. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ballard Marine Construction, LLC
Represented By: Kenderick Mason Jordan
Represented By: Shari L. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?