Sango #252200 v. Naeyaert et al
Plaintiff: Robert D. Sango #252200
Defendant: Unknown Naeyaert, Unknown Hoover, Unknown Loman and Unknown Theut
Case Number: 2:2022cv00153
Filed: July 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Hala Y Jarbou
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 JUDGMENT dismissing case without prejudice; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #2 application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; denying as moot #9 motion for preliminary injunction and for TRO; denying #10 motion for order to show cause; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause #13 , Judgment Dismissing Case #14 sent via U.S. Mail to Robert D. Sango (mlc)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER from plaintiff to Judge Vermaat regarding status of case (pjw)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DECLARATION re #10 by plaintiff Robert D. Sango #252200 (pjw)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for order to show cause by plaintiff Robert D. Sango #252200; (pjw)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for preliminary injunction , MOTION for temporary restraining order by plaintiff Robert D. Sango #252200; (Attachments: #1 Letter to Litigation Coordinator) (mlc)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Opinion #7 and Order Setting Misc. Deadline - Prisoner #8 sent via U.S. Mail to Robert D. Sango #252200 (pjw)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting miscellaneous deadline: pro se misc deadline set for 9/16/2022 - to show cause why he should not be barred from proceeding IFP due to three strikes or pay the filing fee; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 OPINION; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou and Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat for all further proceedings (pjw)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STATEMENT RE CONSENT by plaintiff Robert D. Sango #252200 requesting the case be assigned to a district judge (pjw)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case to DJ (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Robert D. Sango #252200 (pjw)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE to plaintiff regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 8/17/2022 (pjw)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Robert D. Sango #252200 (pjw)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (pjw)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Robert D. Sango #252200 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (pjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sango #252200 v. Naeyaert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert D. Sango #252200
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Naeyaert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Loman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Theut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?