Graham #193576 v. Ledford et al
Plaintiff: Steve Graham #193576
Defendant: P. Ledford and J. McDonald
Case Number: 2:2022cv00181
Filed: September 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Order #9 , Judgment Dismissing Case #10 sent via U.S. Mail to Steve Graham #193576 (eod)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JUDGMENT dismissing case without prejudice; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (elam)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Dismissing Case and Denying #2 Motion to Proceed IFP; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (elam)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RESPONSE TO #5 filed by plaintiff Steve Graham #193576 (eod)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Judge Robert J. Jonker and Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat for all further proceedings (eod)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case to DJ (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Steve Graham #193576 (eod)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STATEMENT RE CONSENT by plaintiff Steve Graham #193576 requesting the case be assigned to a district judge (eod)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER setting miscellaneous deadline: pro se misc deadline set for 10/27/2022; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Opinion (Screening) #4 , Order Setting Misc. Deadline - Prisoner #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Steve Graham #193576 (eod)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE to plaintiff regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 10/11/2022 (eod)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Steve Graham #193576; (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Financial Documents) (eod)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against P. Ledford, J. McDonald filed by Steve Graham #193576 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (eod)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Steve Graham #193576 (eod)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graham #193576 v. Ledford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Graham #193576
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Ledford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?