Bartnik v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Plaintiff: Stacie A Bartnik and Stacie A. Bartnik
Defendant: Walmart Inc., Walmart Stores East, LLP, Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart, Inc. and Unknown Party #1
Case Number: 2:2022cv00212
Filed: November 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Paul L Maloney
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2023 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Amend Complaint and Case Caption by defendants Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart, Inc. (Cross, Matthew)
December 22, 2022 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart, Inc. for interrogatories and requests to produce with records authorizations (Cross, Matthew)
December 20, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of status conference set for 4/10/2023 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; (cam)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 8/30/2023; dispositive motions due by 9/28/2023; settlement conference set for 4/18/2024 at 09:30 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; final pretrial conference set for 4/29/2024 at 09:30 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; jury trial set for 5/13/2024 at 09:00 AM at Marquette, MI before Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
December 20, 2022 Filing 11 MINUTES of scheduling conference held before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat by video(Proceedings Not Recorded) (cam)
December 15, 2022 Filing 10 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Cross, Matthew)
December 7, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE rescheduling hearing that was previously set for same date at 11:00; Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 12/20/2022 at 11:15 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; (cam)
December 6, 2022 Filing 8 AMENDED ANSWER to complaint with affirmative defenses and jury demand reliance by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart, Inc. (Cross, Matthew) Modified text on 12/6/2022; this entry replaces #6 (ems).
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 12/20/2022 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; status report due 12/15/2022; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
November 22, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to complaint with affirmative defenses and jury demand reliance by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart, Inc. (Cross, Matthew)
November 10, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ems)
November 10, 2022 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP identifying Corporate Parent WSE Management LLC, Corporate Parent WSE Investment LLC for Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Cross, Matthew) Modified text on 11/10/2022 (ems).
November 10, 2022 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendants Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6896877 (Cross, Matthew) Modified text on 11/10/2022 (ems).
November 9, 2022 Filing 3 VERIFICATION STATEMENT re #2 by defendants Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Cross, Matthew) Modified text on 11/10/2022 (ems).
November 9, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Gogebic County Circuit Court case number 2022-183-NO filed by Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (Cross, Matthew) Modified text on 11/10/2022 (ems).
November 9, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF FILING notice of removal re #2 directed to Plaintiff and Gogebic County Circuit Court by defendants Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Cross, Matthew) Modified text on 11/10/2022 (ems).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bartnik v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacie A Bartnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacie A. Bartnik
Represented By: Dominic F. Andriacchi
Represented By: Dominic Francis Andriacchi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Matthew W. Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores East, LLP
Represented By: Matthew W. Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust
Represented By: Matthew W. Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Matthew W. Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew W. Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?