Riddle #811130 v. James et al
Plaintiff: Trequan Riddle #811130
Defendant: Brenda James, Charles Scott, Unknown Kubant, Patricia Lamb and S. Smoyer
Case Number: 2:2023cv00057
Filed: March 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2023 Copy of Order #7 , Judgment Dismissing Case #8 sent via U.S. Mail to Trequan Riddle #811130 (jjm)
May 19, 2023 Filing 8 JUDGMENT dismissing case without prejudice; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER dismissing case and denying Plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel #3 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
April 11, 2023 Filing 6 STATEMENT RE CONSENT by plaintiff Trequan Riddle #811130 consenting to proceed before the Magistrate Judge (ns)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DEFICIENCY ORDER: plaintiff/petitioner has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 5/2/2023 or the action will be dismissed; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
April 4, 2023 Copy of Deficiency Order #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Trequan Riddle #811130 (ems)
April 3, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE to plaintiff regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 4/24/2023 (ems)
April 3, 2023 Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Trequan Riddle #811130 (ems)
March 31, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION to appoint counsel by plaintiff Trequan Riddle #811130; (ems)
March 31, 2023 Filing 2 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by plaintiff Trequan Riddle #811130 (ems)
March 31, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Brenda James, Unknown Kubant, Patricia Lamb, Charles Scott, S. Smoyer filed by Trequan Riddle #811130 (ems)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riddle #811130 v. James et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trequan Riddle #811130
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Kubant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Smoyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?