Riddle #811130 v. Moyer et al
Plaintiff: Trequan Riddle #811130
Defendant: S. Moyer, Sabrina Aiken, Brenda James, Charles Scott, Kelly Wellman, Unknown Lutjens and Unknown Samuelson
Case Number: 2:2023cv00058
Filed: March 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2023 Filing 8 JUDGMENT dismissing case without prejudice; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (elam)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, dismissing case and denying #4 motion to appoint counsel; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (elam)
May 18, 2023 Copy of Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel #7 , Judgment Dismissing Case #8 sent via U.S. Mail to Trequan Riddle #811130 (mlc)
May 1, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Judge Robert J. Jonker and Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat for all further proceedings (jjm)
May 1, 2023 Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case to DJ (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Trequan Riddle #811130 (jjm)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DEFICIENCY ORDER: plaintiff/petitioner has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 5/2/2023 or the action will be dismissed; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
April 4, 2023 Copy of Deficiency Order, #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Trequan Riddle (mlc)
April 3, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE to plaintiff regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 4/24/2023 (mlc)
April 3, 2023 Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Trequan Riddle (mlc)
March 31, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to appoint counsel by plaintiff Trequan Riddle #811130; (mlc)
March 31, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Trequan Riddle #811130; (mlc)
March 31, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Trequan Riddle #811130 (mlc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riddle #811130 v. Moyer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trequan Riddle #811130
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabrina Aiken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Wellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Lutjens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Samuelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?