Coleman #379771 v. Kent et al
Plaintiff: Charlie Coleman #379771
Defendant: Unknown Kent, Unknown Part(y)(ies) #1, Unknown Allen, Unknown Leach and Thomas O. Mohrman
Case Number: 2:2023cv00172
Filed: September 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2023 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants Unknown Allen, Unknown Kent, Unknown Leach re Attorney Appearance (Limited) (Lane, Alicia)
October 2, 2023 (NON-DOCUMENT) LIMITED ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Alicia Lane on behalf of defendants Unknown Allen, Unknown Kent, Unknown Leach for purposes of the Prisoner Civil Rights Litigation Early Mediation Program (Lane, Alicia)
September 15, 2023 Filing 5 STATEMENT RE CONSENT by plaintiff Charlie Coleman #379771 consenting to proceed before the Magistrate Judge (mg)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER STAYING CASE and referring to EARLY MEDIATION: case is stayed for 120 days to allow parties to participate in mediation; IFP is granted; the 90-day period for service is tolled; the MI Attorney General shall enter a limited appearance by October 5, 2023; w/attached Protocol; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
September 14, 2023 Copy of Order Staying Case and Referring to Early Mediation Program, #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Charlie Coleman #379771 (mlc)
September 6, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE to plaintiff regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 9/27/2023 (ems)
September 6, 2023 Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Charlie Coleman #379771 (ems)
September 5, 2023 Filing 2 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT statement by plaintiff Charlie Coleman #379771 (ems) Modified text on 9/6/2023 (ems).
September 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Unknown Allen, Unknown Kent, Unknown Leach, Thomas O. Mohrman, Unknown Part(y)(ies) #1 filed by Charlie Coleman #379771 (ems)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman #379771 v. Kent et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie Coleman #379771
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Kent
Represented By: Alicia Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Part(y)(ies) #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Allen
Represented By: Alicia Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Leach
Represented By: Alicia Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas O. Mohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?