Valentine #389916 v. Schroeder et al
Plaintiff: Isaiah Valentine #389916
Defendant: Sarah Schroeder, Unknown Party #2 and Unknown Party #1
Case Number: 2:2024cv00210
Filed: December 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STATEMENT RE CONSENT by plaintiff Isaiah Valentine #389916 consenting to proceed before the Magistrate Judge (ns)
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE to plaintiff regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 1/3/2025 (mg)
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 2:24-cv-13294; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (mg)
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION AND ORDER TRANSFERRING PLAINTIFF'S CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF MICHIGAN. Signed by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (LHos) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 12/13/2024.]
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Order Transferring Case to Western District of Michigan mailed to Isaiah Valentine #389916, CENTRAL MICHIGAN CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, 320 HUBBARD, ST. LOUIS, MI 48880. (LHos) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 12/13/2024.]
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Isaiah Valentine #389916 (mg)
December 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Mediation Program (JHea) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 12/13/2024.]
December 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Isaiah Valentine. (JHea) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 12/13/2024.]
December 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Isaiah Valentine against John Doe, Schroeder (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JHea) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 12/13/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valentine #389916 v. Schroeder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaiah Valentine #389916
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?