Warner #297342 v. Johnston et al
Plaintiff: Gavin Wade Warner #297342
Defendant: Unknown Johnston, Unknown Meehan and James Corrigan
Case Number: 2:2025cv00026
Filed: February 7, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JUDGMENT that the action is dismissed as frivolous, malicious, or for failure to state a claim; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
March 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 OPINION; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
March 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff may proceed in forma pauperis without payment of an initial partial filing fee; plaintiff to remain liable for the filing fee as funds become available; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
March 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Prisoner #6 , Opinion #7 and Judgment - Frivolous, Malicious, or for Failure to State a Claim #8 sent via U.S. Mail to Gavin Wade Warner #297342 (pjw)
February 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT statement by plaintiff Gavin Wade Warner #297342 (ns)
February 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STATEMENT RE CONSENT by plaintiff Gavin Wade Warner #297342 consenting to proceed before the Magistrate Judge (ns)
February 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE to plaintiff regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 3/3/2025 (eod)
February 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Gavin Wade Warner #297342 (pjw)
February 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Gavin Wade Warner #297342; (eod)
February 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against J. Corrigan, Unknown Johnston, Unknown Meehan filed by Gavin Wade Warner #297342 (eod)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warner #297342 v. Johnston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gavin Wade Warner #297342
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Meehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?