R & D Financial Solutions et al v. Western Thrift and Loan Corp. et al
Plaintiff: R & D Financial Solutions, Dan Pullis and Robert Maki
Defendant: Columbia Trust Company, Homeowners Lending Corp. and Western Thrift and Loan Corp.
Case Number: 0:2007cv04306
Filed: October 19, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Hennepin
Presiding Judge: David S. Doty
Presiding Judge: Jeanne J. Graham
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER granting 165 Motion to require additional bond security pending appeal (Written Opinion). Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 10/18/2011. (PJM)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER denying 152 Motion to disqualify bonding company and disallow bond (Written Opinion). Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 8/11/2011. (PJM)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 132 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AND ORDER FOR JUDGMENT(Written Opinion). Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 2/18/2011. (PJM)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting 84 Motion for Default Judgment (Written Opinion). Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 5/10/2010. (PJM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R & D Financial Solutions et al v. Western Thrift and Loan Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homeowners Lending Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Thrift and Loan Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R & D Financial Solutions
Represented By: Todd M Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Pullis
Represented By: Todd M Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Maki
Represented By: Todd M Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?