Central Livestock Association, Inc. et al v. R&J Dairy et al
Plaintiff: |
Central Livestock Association, Inc. and Genex Cooperative, Inc |
Defendant: |
R&J Dairy, Richard E Millner and James L Nickeson |
Case Number: |
0:2008cv00155 |
Filed: |
January 15, 2008 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the District of Minnesota |
Office: |
DMN Office |
County: |
Dakota |
Presiding Judge: |
Ericksen |
Presiding Judge: |
Graham |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 22, 2009 |
Filing
91
ORDER : IT IS ORDERED THAT:1.The September 19 stipulation regarding an award of attorney fees and costs [Docket No. 89] is APPROVED.2.The October 20 stipulation regarding the dismissal of Plaintiffs claims for unjust enrichment, conversion, and accou nts stated [Docket No. 90] is APPROVED.3.Plaintiffs claims for unjust enrichment, conversion, and accounts stated are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. 4.R & J Dairy, Millner, and Nickeson are jointly and severally liable to Genex Cooperative for damages in the amount of $1,533,948.10 as of June 5, 2009, plus additional service fees accruing in the amount of $324.24 per day.5.R & J Dairy, Millner, and Nickeson are jointly and severally liable to Plaintiffs for attorney fees and costs in the amount of $138,725.00.LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY.(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on October 22, 2009. (slf)
|
August 14, 2009 |
Filing
87
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED THAT:1.Plaintiffs Motion for Entry of Default Judgment Against R & J Dairy [Docket No. 60] is GRANTED respect to damages for breach of the LFAs and DENIED with respect to attorney fees and costs.2.Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Ju dgment Against Richard E. Millner and James L. Nickeson [Docket No. 66] is GRANTED with respect to damages for breach of the LFAs and DENIED with respect to attorney fees and costs.3.R & J, Millner, and Nickeson are jointly and severally liable to Ge nex for damages in the amount of $1,533,948.10 as of June 5, 2009, plus additional service fees accruing in the amount of $324.24 per day.4.In the event that the parties are unable to reach an agreement regarding the unresolved matters in this case, the parties are granted leave to file additional dispositive motions on or before September 18, 2009.(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on August 14, 2009. (slf)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?