Trek Bicycle Corporation v. LeMond Cycling, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Trek Bicycle Corporation
Defendant: LeMond Cycling, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2008cv02440
Filed: June 18, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kyle
Presiding Judge: Mayeron
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that pursuant to the unopposed Motion to Consolidate Cases by Trek Bicycle Corporation, the matters of Civil No. 08cv1010 and Civil No. 08-2440 are consolidated for all purposes. The Clerk may close Civil File No. 08-2440, and merge the contents thereof with Civil No. 08-1010 RHK/JSM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 6/26/08. (JME)
June 25, 2008 Filing 16 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Todd G. Smith and Linda S. Schmidt) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Rahne, Denise)
June 25, 2008 *** Attorney Linda-NA S Schmidt and Todd-NA G Smith terminated. (jdf)
June 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. Case reassigned to Judge Richard H. Kyle and Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron for all further proceedings. Senior Judge David S. Doty, Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham no longer assigned to case. The new case number is 08cv2440 RHK/JSM. Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 6/19/08 and Judge David S. Doty on 6/20/08. (JME)
June 18, 2008 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Western; Case Number 3:08-cv-00198. Original file with documents numbered 1 - 13, copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 7 MOTION to Transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of Minnesota. Signed by Judge Barbara B Crabb on 6/16/2008. (arw) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/18/2008.]
June 16, 2008 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Trek Bicycle Corporation re 11 Brief in Opposition, (Weber, Ralph) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/18/2008.]
June 13, 2008 Filing 11 BRIEF in Opposition by Plaintiff Trek Bicycle Corporation re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Transfer Venue filed by LeMond Cycling, Inc. Consent to transfer to District of Minnesota. (Weber, Ralph) Modified docket text on 6/16/2008 (Wiseman, Andrew). CONTACTED ATTORNEY RE: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Olson, Marlene). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/18/2008.]
June 12, 2008 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Sidney D. Bluming filed by Defendant LeMond Cycling, Inc. re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Transfer Venue filed by LeMond Cycling, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 3/31/08 Email) (Rahne, Denise) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/18/2008.]
June 12, 2008 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Denise S. Rahne filed by Defendant LeMond Cycling, Inc. re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Transfer Venue filed by LeMond Cycling, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Media Advisory # 2 Exhibit 2 - Order # 3 Exhibit 3 - Trek's Memorandum) (Rahne, Denise) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/18/2008.]
June 12, 2008 Filing 8 BRIEF in Support by Defendant LeMond Cycling, Inc. re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Transfer Venue filed by LeMond Cycling, Inc. (Rahne, Denise) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/18/2008.]
June 12, 2008 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Transfer Venue by Defendant LeMond Cycling, Inc. Brief in Opposition due by 7/3/2008, Brief in Reply due by 7/14/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Rahne, Denise) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/18/2008.]
May 23, 2008 Filing 6 Set Pretrial Conference: [Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call.Pretrial Conference set for 6/19/2008 at 9:00 AM. (arw) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/18/2008.]
May 22, 2008 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant LeMond Cycling, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Rahne, Denise) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/18/2008.]
May 22, 2008 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Defendant LeMond Cycling, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Rahne, Denise) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/18/2008.]
April 17, 2008 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Trek Bicycle Corporation. (Dombrowicki, Christopher) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/18/2008.]
April 14, 2008 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against LeMond Cycling, Inc. (Filing fee $350, receipt number 190747) filed by Trek Bicycle Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit) (Weber, Ralph) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/18/2008.]
April 9, 2008 Judge Stephen L Crocker assigned. (lak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/18/2008.]
April 9, 2008 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker sent: Briefing Guidelines, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Order regarding assignment of U.S. Magistrate Judge to civil cases, Declination to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, Order on Dispositive Motions. (lak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/18/2008.]
April 9, 2008 Summons Issued as to LeMond Cycling, Inc. (lak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/18/2008.]
April 8, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT RE-FILED WITH CORRECT LOGIN/PASSWORD AS DOCKET #2COMPLAINT against LeMond Cycling, Inc. (Filing fee $350, receipt number 190747) filed by Trek Bicycle Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet # 4 Summons) (Dombrowicki, Christopher) Modified on 4/14/2008 (Jacobson, Kris): ATTORNEY CONTACTE, ASKED TO RE-FILE WITH CORRECT LOGIN. [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/18/2008.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trek Bicycle Corporation v. LeMond Cycling, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trek Bicycle Corporation
Represented By: Ralph-NA A Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LeMond Cycling, Inc.
Represented By: Todd-NA G Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?