USA v. Petters, et al.
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Thomas Joseph Petters, Deanna Coleman, Robert White, James Wehmhoff, Larry Reynolds, Michael Catain and Frank E. Vennes, Jr.
Receiver: Douglas A Kelley and Gary Hansen
Movant: Allen J. Munson
Intervenor: Minnwest Bank M.V., Minnwest Bank Metro and Crown Bank
Case Number: 0:2008cv05348
Filed: February 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
Presiding Judge: Janie S. Mayeron
Presiding Judge: Ann D. Montgomery
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 31:3731 Fraud

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3223 ORDER TERMINATING THE RECEIVERSHIP OF DEFENDANT THOMAS J. PETTERS AND DISSOLVING THE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; granting 3214 Plaintiff United States of America's Motion to Dissolve the Preliminary Injunction and to Terminate the Receivership of Defendant Thomas J. Petters (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 1/8/2021. (TLU)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2915 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 2897 Intervenors Ritchie Capital Management, L.L.C.; Ritchie Special Credit Investments, Ltd.; Rhone Holdings II, Ltd.; Yorkville Investment I, L.L.C., and Ritchie Capital Management, Ltd.'s Motion to Terminate Receivership or, Alternatively, to Lift the Litigation Stay Against Thomas J. Petters (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 09/27/2017. (TLU)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2784 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 2710 Ritchie Capital Management, L.L.C.; Ritchie Special Credit Investments, Ltd.; Rhone Holdings II. Ltd.; and Ritchie Capital Management Ltd.'s Motion to Intervene; denying 2714 Ritchie Capital Manage ment, L.L.C.; Ritchie Special Credit Investments, Ltd.; Rhone Holdings II. Ltd.; and Ritchie Capital Management Ltd.'s Motion to Lift Stay; granting 2757 Yorkville Investment I, L.L.C.'s Motion to Intervene; denying 2757 Yorkville Inv estment I, L.L.C.'s Motion to Lift Stay; granting 2766 John R. Stoebner, in his capacity as the Chapter 7 Trustee of Polaroid Corporation, et al., Douglas A. Kelley, in his capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee of Petters Company Inc., et al., and Randall L. Seaver, in his capacity as the Chapter 7 Trustee of Petters Capital, LLC's Motion to Intervene (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 09/14/2015. (TLU)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2752 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 2724 Trustee Gary Hansen's Motion to Compel Funds from Defendant Frank E. Vennes, Jr. and his attorneys James Volling and Faegre Baker Daniels LLP and Kimberly Vennes and for an Accounting (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 06/08/2015. (TLU)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2707 ORDER REGARDING PAYMENTS FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES OF FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP AND DIRECTING TRANSFER OF VENNES RELATED FUNDS BEING HELD IN TRUST BY FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP; granting in part and denying in part 2700 Motion for Attorney Fees (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 12/23/2014. (TLU)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2532 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 2486 Motion to Intervene (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 7/26/2013. (GS) cc: Peter J. Leveton. Modified on 7/26/2013 (lmb).
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2469 ORDER AUTHORIZING AND CONFIRMING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND RELEASE BETWEEN THE RETREAT AND DOUGLAS A. KELLEY, RECEIVER; granting 2447 Motion for Approval of Settlement (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 03/26/2013. (TLU)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2187 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 2133 Mukamal's Motion to Intervene; denying 2136 Mukamal's Motion to Lift Stay (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 03/12/2012. (TLU) cc: Peter J. Leveton Modified on 3/12/2012 (jam).
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1862 ORDER FOR AUTHORIZATION TO MAKE PAYMENTS; granting 1811 Motion for Attorney Fees of Fruth Jamison & Elsass, PLLC; granting 1814 Motion for Attorney Fees of Bernick, Lifson, Greenstein, Greene & Liszt, PA; denying 1817 Motion for Attorney Fees L eonard Street & Deinard; granting 1820 Motion for Attorney Fees of Lindquist & Vennum, PLLP; granting 1823 Motion for Attorney Fees of Lindquist & Vennum, PLLP; granting 1826 Motion for Attorney Fees of Lindquist & Vennum, PLLP; granting 1829 Motion for Attorney Fees Lindquist & Vennum PLLP; granting in part and denying in part 1832 Motion for Attorney Fees Felhaber, Larson, Fenlon & Voft, PA; granting in part and denying in part 1835 Motion for Attorney Fees of PricewaterhouseCooper s, LLP; granting in part and denying in part 1838 Motion for Attorney Fees of PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP; granting in part and denying in part 1841 Motion for Attorney Fees of PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP; granting 1844 Motion for Attorney Fees of Tonya Rosso; granting 1847 Motion for Attorney Fees of Kelley, Wolter & Scott, PA (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 05/03/2011. (TLU)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1798 ORDER granting 1783 Motion for Authorization to Vote Shares of New Common Stock in MN Airline Holdings, Inc. held by Thomas J. Petters and Petters Aircraft Leasing, LLC (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 03/30/2011. (TLU)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1773 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 1615 Motion for Order of Sale of Tribute Sounds Catalog; denying 1619 Motion for Order to Release Funds from the Q Records and Entertainment Checking Account; granting 1623 Motion for Order of Sale of the H ouse of Beauty Catalog of Music; granting in part and denying in part 1656 Motion for Division of Proceeds from the sale of the Catain home or, alternatively, an extention of monthly living expenses; denying 1657 Motion requesting an accounting and award of Q Records' funds and release of Q Records' ownership rights and interests (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 02/10/11. (TLU)
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1762 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 1589 Motion to Intervene; having been heard on the Joint Motion to Approve the Asset Distribution Plan, the Palm Beach Trustee is terminated as an intervening party in this action; granting 1652 Motion for Approval of Settlement (Asset Distristribution Plan) in accordance with this Order (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 01/25/2011. (TLU)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1665 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 1474 Antoinette Reynolds' MOTION for Emergency Relief to the extent it seeks payment of living expenses beyond health insurance premiums (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 12/06/2010. (TLU)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1608 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Asset Based Resource Group's 1272 Motion Terminate Receivership and Discharge Receiver as to Petters Aircraft Leasing, LLC or in the Alternative to Appoint an Independent Receiver (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 11/16/2010. (TLU)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1547 ORDER for Authorization to Make Payments Related to Frank E. Vennes; granting in part and denying in part 1525 Motion for Attorney Fees for Faegre & Benson, Holland & Knight, Ruden & McClosky, Oppenheimer, Baker Tilly Virchow Krause (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 10/20/2010. (TLU)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1545 ORDER denying 1474 Antoinette Reynolds' Motion to Intervene and granting Partial Emergency Relief (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 10/19/2010. (TLU)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1506 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 1401 Motion for Attorney Fees of Kelley, Wolter & Scott, PA; granting 1405 Motion for Attorney Fees of Lindquist & Vennum PLLP; granting 1409 Motion for Attorney Fees Dorsey & Whitney, LLP; granting in part and denying in part 1413 Motion for Order to Approve Fee Application of FTI Consulting, Inc.; granting in part and denying in part 1417 Motion for Attorney Fees of Haynes and Boone, LLP; granting 1421 Motion for Order to Approve Fee Applicatio n of Tonya Rosso; granting in part and denying in part 1425 Motion for Attorney Fees of Greene Espel, PLLP; granting in part and denying in part 1429 Motion for Attorney Fees of Leonard, Street & Deinard (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 09/30/2010. (TLU)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1483 ORDER granting 1353 Motion for Attorney Fees of Lindquist & Vennum, PLLP; granting 1358 Motion for Order to Approve Fee Application of Tonya Rosso; granting 1362 Motion for Attorney Fees of Colich & Associates; granting 1366 Motion for Attorney Fees of Kelley, Wolter & Scott, PA (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 09/23/2010. (TLU)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1467 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1280 Motion for Attorney Fees of Kelley Wolter & Scott; granting 1284 Motion for Attorney Fees of Lindquist & Vennum PLLP; granting in part and denying in part 1288 Motion for Or der to Approve Fee Application of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP; granting in part and denying in part 1302 Motion for Attorney Fees of Sands & Moskowitz; granting in part and denying in part 1306 Motion for Attorney Fees of Leonard Street & Deinard PA; granting 1310 Motion for Attorney Fees of Greene Espel, PLLP; granting 1314 Motion for Attorney Fees of Felhaber, Larson, Fenlon & Vogt, PA; granting 1318 Motion for Attorney Fees of Paul Engh; granting in part and denying in part 1322 Mo tion for Attorney Fees of Frederic Bruno & Associates; granting 1326 Motion for Attorney Fees of Lindquist & Vennum PLLP; granting 1330 Motion for Attorney Fees of Kelley Wolter & Scott, PA (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 09/15/2010. (TLU)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1400 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 1256 Motion for Attorney Fees of Kelley, Wolter & Scott, P.A.; granting in part and denying in part 1260 Motion for Attorney Fees of Lindquist & Vennum, PLLP; granting in part and denying in part 1265 Motio n for Order to Approve Fee Application of PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP. Kelley, Wolter & Scott, P.A. shall provide task based billing statements for all services performed after the date of this Order (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 08/31/2010. (TLU)
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1393 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 1246 Receiver Kelley's Motion for Reconsideration of Stratify Costs Deducted from Fee Applications Filed in Favor of Pricewaterhouse Coopers, LLP (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 08/26/2010. (TLU)
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1335 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1201 Motion for Order to Approve Fee Application of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP; granting 1214 Motion for Attorney Fees of Kelley, Wolter & Scott, P.A.; granting in part and denying in part 1218 Motion for Attorney Fees Lindquist & Vennum PLLP; granting in part and denying in part 1222 Motion for Order to Approve Fee Application of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 08/11/10. (TLU)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1172 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1123 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part and denying in part 1127 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part and denying in part 1131 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part and denying in part 1135 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 1139 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 1144 Motion for Attorney Fees (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 6/2/2010. (GS)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1165 ORDER granting 1102 Motion for Attorney Fees Related to Frank E. Vennes(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 05/27/2010. (TLU)
May 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1153 MEMORANDUM OPINON AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1107 Motion for Attorney Fees of Kelley, Wolter & Scott; granting 1111 Motion for Attorney Fees of Lindquist & Vennum; granting in part and denying in part 1115 Motion for Order to Approve Fee Application of PricewaterhouseCoopers(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 05/21/2010. (TLU)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1120 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1071 Motion for Attorney Fees of Kelley, Wolter & Scott; granting 1075 Motion for Attorney Fees Lindquist & Vennum; granting in part and denying in part 1079 Motion for Order to Approve Fee Application of PricewaterhouseCoopers; granting in part and denying in part 1083 Motion for Attorney Fees of Colich & Associates; granting 1088 Motion for Attorney Fees of Frederic Bruno & Associates; granting 1092 Motion for Attorney Fees of Greene Espel (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 05/17/2010. (TLU)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1099 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1030 Motion for Attorney Fees of Haynes and Boone; granting 1034 Motion for Attorney Fees of James E. Ostgard; granting 1038 Motion for Attorney Fees of Dorsey & Whitney; grantin g in part and denying in part 1042 Motion for Attorney Fees of Lindquist & Vennum; granting in part and denying in part 1046 Motion for Order to Approve Fee Application of PricewaterhouseCoopers; granting 1050 Motion for Attorney Fees of Kelley, Wolter & Scott (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 05/11/2010. (TLU)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1087 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 1018 Motion for Attorney Fees of Kelley, Wolter & Scott; granting in part and denying in part 1022 Motion for Attorney Fees of Lindquist & Vennnum; granting in part and denying in part 1026 Motion for Order to Approve Fee Application of PricewaterhouseCoopers (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 05/05/2010. (TLU)
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1017 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 962 Motion for Attorney Fees of Kelley, Wolter & Scott, PA; granting in part and denying in part 966 Motion for Attorney Fees of Lindquist & Vennum, PLLP; granting in part and denying in part 970 Motion for Order to Approve Fee Application of PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP; granting in part and denying in part 974 Motion for Attorney Fees of Leonard Street & Deinard (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 04/23/2010. (TLU)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 897 ORDER granting 851 Motion for Order to Approve Fee Application of FTI Consulting, Inc.; granting 859 Motion for Order to Approve Fee Application of Tonya Rosso; granting in part and denying in part 879 Motion for Attorney Fees of Felhaber, Lars on, Fenlon & Vogt, PA. Receiver Kelley's motions are CONTINUED as to Docket Nos. 855, 863, 867, 871, and 875. Receiver Kelley and the Government shall confer regarding an agreed-upon level of specificity to be included in pending and future mo tions to approve professional fees. On or before February 18, 2010, the Receiver and Government shall file with the Court a joint proposal regarding the additional specificity, if any, to be included in pending and future fee petitions (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 02/09/2010. (TLU)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 850 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 806 Motion for Attorney Fees of Felhaber, Larson, Fenlon & Vogt; granting 810 Motion for Attorney Fees of Paul Engh; granting 814 Motion for Attorney Fees of Greene Espel; granti ng 818 Motion for Attorney Fees of Colich & Associates; granting 822 Motion for Attorney Fees of Peter B. Wold; granting 826 Motion for Attorney Fees of Bernick, Lifson, Greenstein, Greene & Liszt; granting in part and denying in part 830 Mot ion for Attorney Fees of Best & Flanagan; granting 834 Motion for Attorney Fees of Sands & Moskowitz; granting 838 Motion for Order to Approve Fee Application of Tonya Rosso; granting 842 Motion for Attorney Fees of Kelley, Wolter & Scott (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 1/11/2010. (TLU)
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 802 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 739 Motion for Attorney Fees of Susman Godfrey LLP; granting 765 Motion for Attorney Fees of Kelley, Wolter & Scott, PA; granting 769 Motion for Attorney Fees of Lindquist & Vennum PLLP; granting in part an d denying in part 773 Motion for Attorney Fees of Susman Godfrey, LLP. Receiver Kelley's motions are CONTINUED as to Docket Nos. 777 and 781 until December 22, 2009. Any objection by the Government to the continued motions must be filed by that date (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 12/17/2009. (TLU)
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 764 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 735 Motion for Attorney Fees of Kelley, Wolter & Scott; denying without prejudice 743 Motion for Attorney Fees of Leonard Street & Deinard; granting in part and denying in part 747 Motion for Attorney Fees of Felhaber, Larson, Fenlon & Voft; granting 751 Motion for Attorney Fees of Paul Engh; the Motion as to Susman's fee petition [Docket Number 739] remains under advisement pending Receiver Kelley's providing to the Court on or before December 15, 2009 for the Court's in camera review a narrative description of the services performed by Susman (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 12/04/2009. (TLU)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 755 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 718 Motion for Attorney Fees to Felhaber, Larson, Fenlon and Vogt, P.A.; granting 722 Motion for Attorney Fees to Paul Engh(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 11/25/2009. (TLU)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 731 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 702 Motion for Attorney Fees as to Felhaber, Larson, Fenlon & Vogt, P.A.; granting 706 Motion for Attorney Fees as to Paul Engh (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 11/23/2009. (TLU)
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 701 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 688 Motion for Attorney Fees to Felhaber, Larson, Fenlon & Vogt; granting 692 Motion for Attorney Fees to Paul Engh (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 11/10/2009. (TLU)
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 658 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 634 Motion for Attorney Fees of Felhaber, Larson, Fenlon & Vogt; granting in part and denying in part 638 Motion for Attorney Fees of Paul Engh (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 10/14/2009. (TLU)
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 536 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 469 Receiver Kelley's Motion for Attorney Fees for Kelley & Wolter; granting in part and denying in part 473 Receiver Kelley's Motion for Attorney Fees for Linquist & Vennum; granting in part and de nying in part 477 Receiver Kelley's Motion for Attorney Fees for Felhaber, Larson, Fenlong & Vogt; granting 481 Receiver Kelley's Motion for Attorney Fees for Paul Engh (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 09/01/2009. (TLU)
July 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 441 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 328 Defendant Petters' Motion to Bar Receiver From Providing Data to the Prosecution And For The United States to Pay Receivership Costs (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 07/01/2009. (TLU)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 440 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 331 Motion for Attorney Fees of Kelley & Wolter P.A.; granting in part and denying in part 335 Motion for Attorney Fees of Lindquist & Vennum PLLP; granting 339 Motion for Order to Approve Fee Application o f PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP; granting 343 Motion for Order to Approve Fee Application of PricewaterhouseCoopers Corporate Advisory and Restructuring LLC; granting 347 Motion for Order to Approve Fee Application of FTI Consulting, Inc.; granting 351 Motion for Order to Approve Fee Application of Tonya Rosso; granting 355 Motion for Attorney Fees of Felhaber, Larson Fenlon & Vogt, P.A.; granting 359 Motion for Attorney Fees of Paul Engh; granting in part and denying in part 363 Motion for Attorney Fees of Greene Espel, PLLP; granting in part and denying in part 367 Motion for Attorney Fees of Colich & Associates; granting in part and denying in part 371 Motion for Attorney Fees of Joseph S. Friedberg, Chartered (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 06/30/2009. (TLU)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ORDER granting 388 Motion for Approval of Strict Foreclosure Agreement between Petters Aviation Leasing LLC and CIT Leasing Corporation (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 06/26/2009. (TLU)
June 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 396 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 255 J.P. Morgan's Motion to Intervene (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 06/23/2009. (TLU)
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 282 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 225 Ritchie's Second Emergency Motion to Intervene for the Purpose of Vacating the Preliminary Injunction as to PGW (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 04/29/2009. (TLU)
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER Approving the Sale of 2004 Tiara 2900 Coronet Boat Belonging to Thomas J. Petters pursuant to 237 Amended Stipulation filed by Douglas A. Kelley (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 04/13/2009. (TLU)
March 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 229 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 191 Receiver Kelley's MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Douglas A Kelley (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 03/25/2009. (TLU)
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER FOR AUTHORIZATION TO MAKE PAYMENTS re 191 MOTION for Attorney Fees to Approve Payments for Receiver and Attorney Fees filed by Douglas A Kelley, 195 MOTION for Attorney Fees and to Approve Payments to Receiver filed by Gary Hansen (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 03/20/09. (TLU)
December 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER APPROVING THE SALE OF REAL PROPERTY AND BUSINESS LOCATED AT 675 HIGHWAY 7 EXCELSIOR, MINNESOTA 55331 pursuant to the 166 Affidavit and 164 Stipulation, filed by Douglas A Kelley (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 12/24/2008. (TLU)
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 165 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER re [162 and 163] Orders to clarify that no objections to Receiver Kelley's or Receiver Hansen's requests were made by Plaintiff the United States of America or any other interested party. Also during the course of the De cember 23, 2008 hearing, the Court considered the First Status Reports of Receiver Kelley 160 and Receiver Hansen 159 , which describe the activities that the receivers have undertaken to date. The Court accepted the reports and ordered that Receiver Kelley's and Receiver Hansen's next status reports are due in 60 days (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 12/23/2008. (TLU)
December 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER re 138 Affidavit in Support of Fee application filed by Gary Hansen; arguments on Receiver Hansen's applications will be heard at the hearing scheduled for 10:00 a.m. on December 23, 2008, regarding Receiver Kelley's Motion to Approve Payments of Receiver and Attorney Fees 152 . Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 12/18/2008. (TLU)
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER Approving 134 Motion for Payments to Preserve Assets and Payments of Living Expenses (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 12/16/2008. (TLU)
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 79 Motion to Intervene; granting in part and denying in part 103 Motion to Intervene; granting in part and denying in part 115 Motion to Intervene; denying 139 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Intervene. The motions by LGE, Acorn, and Zenith are GRANTED as to the request to intervene for the requested, limited purpose; the motions by LGE, Acorn, and Zenith are DENIED as to the requests to clarif y, modify, or lift the stay of litigation;having denied the requests for relief from the stay of litigation, LGE, Acorn, and Zenith are terminated as intervening parties in this action (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 12/12/2008. (TLU)
November 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Approving the Sale of Real Property Located at 24 Ocean Drive, Tequesta, Florida 33469, pursuant to the Stipulation 77 filed by the parties and Receiver Gary Hansen (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 11/06/08. (TLU)
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Approving the Sale of Real Property Located at 500 Weatherby Way, Bismarck, North Dakota, 58503, purusant to the Stipulation 74 filed by the parties and Receiver Gary Hansen (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 11/04/2008. (TLU)
October 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER FOR ENTRY OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER, AND OTHER EQUITABLE RELIEF (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 10/16/2008. (tlu)
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER TO MODIFY TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 10/15/2008. (tlu)
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER FOR ENTRY OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER, AND OTHER EQUITABLE RELIEF (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 10/14/2008. (tlu)
October 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying 14 Ritchie Capital Management, et al.'s Motion to Intervene; denying 17 William Procida's Motion to Intervene; denying 17 William Procida's Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 32 Interlachen Harriet Investments Limited's Motion for leave to appear as an interested party(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 10/09/2008. (tlu)
October 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR ENTRY OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER, AND OTHER EQUITABLE RELIEF, granting 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 10/06/08. (LJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Petters, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Gregory G Brooker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Joseph Petters
Represented By: Paul C Engh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deanna Coleman
Represented By: Allan H Caplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert White
Represented By: Joseph S Friedberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Wehmhoff
Represented By: Andrew M Luger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Reynolds
Represented By: Frederic K Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Catain
Represented By: Michael J Colich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank E. Vennes, Jr.
Represented By: Jesseca R.F. Cockson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Douglas A Kelley
Represented By: Terrence J Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Gary Hansen
Represented By: Gary M Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Allen J. Munson
Represented By: Teresa J Ayling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Minnwest Bank M.V.
Represented By: John C Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Minnwest Bank Metro
Represented By: John C Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Crown Bank
Represented By: David B Galle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?