Robinson et al v. Ramsey, County of et al
Plaintiff: Louis Rogers and Richard Robinson
Defendant: John Doe, Ramsey, County of, Jeff Allen and Mary Clausen
Case Number: 0:2008cv05779
Filed: October 20, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Ramsey
Presiding Judge: Boylan
Presiding Judge: Kyle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 107 PRELIMINARY APPROVAL ORDER on Class Certification and Proposed Settlement. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 05/21/10. (kll)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER for Dismissal of all Defendants EXCEPT the County of Ramsey Without Prejudice and for Dismissal of Plaintiff Louis Rogers With Prejudice re 100 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 05/07/10. (kll)
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE Defendant Kristin Nelson re 88 Stipulation. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 03/08/10. (kll)
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE Defendant Brian Loeffelholz and amending case caption re 82 Stipulation. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 03/03/10.(kll)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson et al v. Ramsey, County of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramsey, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Clausen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Rogers
Represented By: Jeffrey M Montpetit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Robinson
Represented By: Jeffrey M Montpetit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?