Almer v. Peanut Corporation of America Featured Case
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Almer
Defendant: Peanut Corporation of America and King Nut Companites
Case Number: 0:2009cv00268
Filed: February 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Hennepin
Presiding Judge: Davis
Presiding Judge: Nelson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332-pip-Diversity-Personal Injury, Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 2/5/10. (KMW)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: 1. This action is stayed until November 1, 2009. 2. On or before November 1, 2009, Plaintiffs counsel shall notify the Court and defendants counsel whether Plaintiff has or has not chosen to participate in the PCA Settlement Procedure ordered by the Bankruptcy Court. 3. If Plaintiff chooses not to participate in the PCA Settlement Procedure, Defendant Kanan shall answer or otherwise plead within twenty (20) days from the date on which Plaintiff notifies Kanan of his decision not to participate in the PCA Settlement Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 7/16/09. (jam)
July 7, 2009 Filing 18 STIPULATION Sixth Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by King Nut Companies, Jeffrey Almer. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Brew, Sarah)
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING FIFTH EXTENSION OF TIME FOR KANAN ENTERPRISES, INC., d/b/a KING NUT COMPANIES TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD: WHEREAS, on May 26, 2009, Plaintiff Jeffrey Almer as trustee for the heirs of Shirley Mae Almer and Defendant Kanan Enterprises, Inc., d/b/a King Nut Companies filed a Fifth Stipulation For Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead; and The Court grants an extension of time to answer or otherwise plead as follows: 1. Defendant Kanan Enterprises, Inc., d/b/a King Nut Companies shall answer or otherwise plead on or before July 7, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 06/01/2009. (MMP)
May 27, 2009 Filing 16 STIPULATION Fifth Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by King Nut Companies, Jeffrey Almer. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Brew, Sarah) Modified filers on 5/28/2009 (lph).
May 13, 2009 Filing 15 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney of Record (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Hibbard, Kathryn)
May 11, 2009 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for King Nut Companites. (Brew, Sarah)
May 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES that 09cv919 is reassigned to Chief Judge Michael J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis and Judge Donovan W. Frank on 5/6/09. (JME)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re 11 Fourth Stipulation for Extension of Time; King Nut Companies Answer now due 5/26/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 4/24/09. (LPH)
April 24, 2009 Filing 11 STIPULATION (Fourth) for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by King Nut Companites, Jeffrey Almer. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Brew, Sarah)
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re 9 Stipulation 1. Defendant Kanan Enterprises, Inc., d/b/a King Nut Companies shall answer or otherwise plead on or before April 24, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 3/30/09. (jdf)
March 23, 2009 Filing 9 STIPULATION (Third) for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by King Nut Companites, Jeffrey Almer. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Brew, Sarah)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Defendant Kanan Enterprises, Inc., d/b/a King Nut Companies shall answeror otherwise plead on or before March 24, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 3/9/09. (jam)
March 6, 2009 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Second) by King Nut Companites, Jeffrey Almer. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Hibbard, Kathryn)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 09cv268 MJD/JSM. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 2/18/09. (JME)
February 17, 2009 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Peanut Corporation of America re 4 Notice of Filing Bankruptcy (Brand, Nicole)
February 17, 2009 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY by Peanut Corporation of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A)(Brand, Nicole)
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD The Court grants an extension of time to answer or otherwise plead as follows: 1. Defendants Peanut Corporation of America and Kanan Enterprises, Inc., d/b/a King Nut Companies shall Answer or otherwise plead on or before March 10, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 02/12/2009. (jz)
February 12, 2009 Filing 2 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by all parties. (Brand, Nicole) Modified filers on 2/13/2009 (lph).
February 5, 2009 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Peanut Corporation of America from Hennepin County District Court, case number unknown. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4030331) assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per Master list and referred to Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson. (Attachments: # 1 Summons and Complaint, # 2 Notice of Filing, # 3 Consent for Removal, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(RLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Almer v. Peanut Corporation of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Almer
Represented By: Fred H Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peanut Corporation of America
Represented By: Charles E Spevacek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King Nut Companites
Represented By: Kathryn N Hibbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?