Semler et al v. Ludeman et al
Plaintiff: |
Raymond L. Semler and Aldridge Taylor |
Defendant: |
Cal Ludeman, Michael Tesneer, Gregg Carlson, Kevin Moser, MSOP-Director, Dennis Benson, Minnesota Sex Offender Program, Dan Hilleren and Joan Fabian |
Case Number: |
0:2009cv00732 |
Filed: |
March 31, 2009 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the District of Minnesota |
Office: |
DMN Office |
County: |
Carlton |
Presiding Judge: |
Montgomery |
Presiding Judge: |
Nelson |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 8, 2010 |
Filing
70
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Adopting 65 Report and Recommendation; granting 31 Motion for Extension of Word Limit in Response to Defendants Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss; granting 36 Motion to Dismiss; denying 41 Mo tion for TRO; denying 42 Motion to Remove Mail and Supplement Issue from State Court to Federal Court; denying 43 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Appeal; denying 50 Motion to Extend ; denying as moot 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting 23 Motion to Dismiss (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 01/08/2010. (TLU)
|
November 23, 2009 |
Filing
65
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Based on the foregoing, and all the files, records and proceedings herein, IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that: 1. Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction Doc. No. 5 be DENIED AS MOOT; 2. Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Doc. No. 41 be DENIED; 3. Plaintiffs Motion for Extension of Word Limit in Response to Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Doc. No. 31 be GRANTED; 4. Plaintiffs' Motion to Remo ve Mail and Supplement Issue from State Court to Federal Court Doc. No. 42 be DENIED; 5. Plaintiffs' Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Appeal Doc. No. 43 be DENIED; 6. Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Doc. No. 50 be DENIED; 7. The Motion to D ismiss brought by Defendants Ludeman, Tesneer, Benson, Carlson and Moser Doc. No. 23 be GRANTED; and 8. The Motion to Dismiss brought by Defendants Hilleren and Fabian Doc. No. 36 be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 12/8/2009 Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 11/23/2009. (MMP)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?