Jackson v. United States Department of Justice et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Jackson
Defendant: Kevin D. Lowry, Office of Probation and Parole, United States Department of Justice and Matthew G. Tveite
Case Number: 0:2009cv00846
Filed: April 13, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Keyes
Presiding Judge: Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re 22 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by Timothy Jackson (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on March 8, 2010. (DML)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 10 Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Kevin D. Lowry, Matthew G. Tveite, Office of Probation and Parole, United States Department of Justice, 19 Report and Recommendation. Motion is GRANTED and this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on December 23, 2009. (HAM)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 10 MOTION to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment filed by Kevin D. Lowry, Matthew G. Tveite, Office of Probation and Parole, United States Department of Justice be Granted and this action be dismissed with prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 12/1/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 11/13/09. (LPH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. United States Department of Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin D. Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Probation and Parole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew G. Tveite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?