Owner-Operator Independent Drivers Association, Inc. et al v. Dunaski et al
Plaintiff: Owner-Operator Independent Drivers Association, Inc., Gary B. Page and Stephen K. House
Defendant: Mark Dunaski, S. Boerner, C. Norton, Ken Urquhart and John Does 1-4
Case Number: 0:2009cv01116
Filed: May 13, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Erickson
Presiding Judge: Frank
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 275 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Motion Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order to Show Cause (Doc. No. 250 ) is DENIED.(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 10/15/2012. (BJS)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 267 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses (Doc. No. 235 ) is GRANTED IN PART as follows: 1. The Cullen Law Firm shall recover attorney fees in the amount of $1,490,356.13 and costs in the amount of $133,003.07 for a total award of $1,623,359.20. 2. The Goins Law Group shall recover attorney fees in the amount of $89,976. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 9/12/2012. (BJS)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 196 FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, ORDER AND MEMORANDUM. See Order for details. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 1/28/2011. (BJS)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. This Memorandum Opinion and Order is to be read in conjunction with the Court's July 30, 2010 Order. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 9/7/2010. (BJS)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 115 Motion in Limine; granting 120 Motion in Limine; denying as moot with respect to Defendants' Exhibits 4, 10, and 11 and denied with respect to Defendants' Exhibit 19 125 Motion in Limine; denying 129 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 143 Motion in Limine; granting 149 Motion in Limine (see Order for details). (Written Opinion.) Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 09/01/2010. (rlb)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER denying 63 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 63 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 71 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 82 Motion to Amend/Correct. See Order for details. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 7/30/2010. (BJS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owner-Operator Independent Drivers Association, Inc. et al v. Dunaski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Dunaski
Represented By: Marsha Eldot Devine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Boerner
Represented By: Marsha Eldot Devine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Norton
Represented By: Marsha Eldot Devine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Urquhart
Represented By: Marsha Eldot Devine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owner-Operator Independent Drivers Association, Inc.
Represented By: Paul D Cullen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary B. Page
Represented By: Joyce- NA E. Mayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen K. House
Represented By: Daniel E Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?