Webb Candy, Inc. et al v. Walmart Stores, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Webb Candy, Inc. and Licensed Sports Marketing, LLC
Defendant: Walmart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2009cv02056
Filed: August 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Dakota
Presiding Judge: Keyes
Presiding Judge: Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2009 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Licensed Sports Marketing, LLC, Webb Candy, Inc. re 28 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, 27 Response to Walmart's Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue (Moore, Steven)
November 6, 2009 Filing 28 LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Licensed Sports Marketing, LLC, Webb Candy, Inc. re 27 Response filed by Licensed Sports Marketing, LLC, Webb Candy, Inc.. (Moore, Steven)
November 6, 2009 Filing 27 RESPONSE re 24 Memorandum in Support of Motion, to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by Licensed Sports Marketing, LLC, Webb Candy, Inc.. (Moore, Steven)
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/15/2010. Discovery due by 7/1/2010. Motions (non-disp) due 7/15/2010. Motions (disp) due by 11/30/2010. Ready for trial due by 4/1/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 11/04/2009. (MMP)
November 4, 2009 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/4/2009. Order to issue. (LPH)
October 30, 2009 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support re 7 Amended MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF filed by Walmart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Snyder, Richard)
October 30, 2009 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Licensed Sports Marketing, LLC, Webb Candy, Inc. re 22 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Moore, Steven)
October 30, 2009 Filing 22 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by all parties.(Moore, Steven) Modified filers on 11/2/2009 (jam).
October 15, 2009 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz: Motion Hearing held on 10/15/2009 re 7 Amended MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by Walmart Stores, Inc. Supplemental briefing due (see minutes). Matter taken under advisement. Written order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Debra Beauvais) (sf)
October 5, 2009 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walmart Stores, Inc. re 17 Declaration in Support, 16 Reply (Snyder, Richard)
October 5, 2009 Filing 17 Supplemental Declaration of Rosalyn Mitchell in Support of 16 Reply filed by Walmart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Placeholder for Exhibits A and B)(Snyder, Richard) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 10/5/09. (KT)
October 5, 2009 Filing 16 REPLY re 7 Amended MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by Walmart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Snyder, Richard)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PROTECTIVE ORDER: Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 10/05/2009. (MMP)
October 2, 2009 Filing 14 STIPULATION Regarding Protective Order by all parties. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Proposed Protective Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Snyder, Richard) Modified filers on 10/5/2009 (jam).
September 25, 2009 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Webb Candy, Inc. re 11 Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue (Watje, Galen)
September 25, 2009 Filing 12 Declaration of Alan Webb in Support of 11 Response filed by Licensed Sports Marketing, LLC, Webb Candy, Inc.. (Watje, Galen)
September 25, 2009 Filing 11 RESPONSE re 7 Amended MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by Licensed Sports Marketing, LLC, Webb Candy, Inc.. (Watje, Galen)
August 31, 2009 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walmart Stores, Inc. re 8 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 7 Amended MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue, 9 Declaration in Support (Snyder, Richard)
August 31, 2009 Filing 9 Declaration of Rosalyn Mitchell in Support of 7 Amended MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by Walmart Stores, Inc.. (Snyder, Richard)
August 31, 2009 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re 7 Amended MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by Walmart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Snyder, Richard)
August 31, 2009 Filing 7 Amended MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue by Walmart Stores, Inc.. (Snyder, Richard)
August 28, 2009 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 11/4/2009 09:30 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 646 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(jam)
August 12, 2009 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walmart Stores, Inc. re 4 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 3 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue (McLaren, Sarah)
August 12, 2009 Filing 4 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 3 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue : Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2009 08:00 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (McLaren, Sarah)
August 12, 2009 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue by Walmart Stores, Inc.. (McLaren, Sarah)
August 10, 2009 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walmart Stores, Inc. that there is no such parent or publicly held corporation to report. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(McLaren, Sarah)
August 6, 2009 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Stores, Inc. from Hennepin County, case number none assigned. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 40036662) assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Master referred to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes, filed by Webb Candy, Inc., Licensed Sports Marketing, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A Summons and Complaint, # 2 Exhibit(s) B Notice to State Court of Removal, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet) (VEM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb Candy, Inc. et al v. Walmart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Webb Candy, Inc.
Represented By: Galen E Watje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Licensed Sports Marketing, LLC
Represented By: Galen E Watje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Richard D Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?