U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Trevor Cook, et al.
Plaintiff: U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Defendant: Trevor Cook, Patrick Kiley, Oxford Global Partners, LLC, Oxford Global Advisors, LLC, Universal Brokerage FX Advisors, LLC, Universal Brokerage FX Growth L.P., Universal Brokerage FX Management LLC and UBS Diversified Growth LLC
Intervenor: The Law Office of William J. Mauzy and William J. Mauzy
Receiver: R.J. Zayed, Carlson, Caspers, Vandenburgh & Lindquist
Case Number: 0:2009cv03332
Filed: November 23, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Dakota
Presiding Judge: Davis
Presiding Judge: Keyes
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 7:6(b) Federal Commodity Exchange Regulation
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1272 ORDER AUTHORIZING THE PAYMENT OF FEES INCURRED BY THE RECEIVERS IN THE ASSOCIATED BANK ACTION THAT WERE NECESSARY TO ASSIST THE RECEIVERS IN THEIR DUTIES. Granting 1351 Motion for Attorney Fees in case 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN; granting 1261 Motion for Attorney Fees in case 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 4/13/17. Associated Cases: 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN, 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN(GRR)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1250 ORDER AUTHORIZING THE PAYMENT OF FEES INCURRED BY THE RECEIVER THAT WERE NECESSARY TO ASSIST THE RECEIVER IN HIS DUTIES. Granting 1332 Motion for Attorney Fees in case 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN; granting 1241 Motion for Attorney Fees in case 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 12/19/16. Associated Cases: 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN, 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN(GRR)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1171 ORDER AUTHORIZING THE PAYMENT OF FEES INCURRED BY THE RECEIVER THAT WERE NECESSARY TO ASSIST THE RECEIVER IN HIS DUTIES. Granting 1227 Motion for Attorney Fees in case 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN and granting 1159 Motion for Attorney Fees in case 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN.(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 7/7/15. Associated Cases: 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN, 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN(GRR)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1170 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Receiver's Motion is granted 1230 Motion for Attorney Fees in case 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN and is granted 1162 Motion for Attorney Fees in case 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 7/1/15. Associated Cases: 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN, 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN(GRR)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1148 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the hearing currently scheduled before this Court on May 14, 2015 in the above referenced cases is cancelled. The Court will reschedule the motions hearing after the Eighth Circuit has issued its decision in the criminal appeals of Defendants Beckman and Kiley.(Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 4/16/15. Associated Cases: 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN, 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN(GRR)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1125 ORDER AUTHORIZING THE PAYMENT OF FEES INCURRED BY THE RECEIVERS IN THE ASSOCIATED BANK ACTION THAT WERE NECESSARY TO ASSIST THE RECEIVERS IN THEIR DUTIES. Granting 1166 Motion for Attorney Fees in case 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN; granting 1115 Motion for Attorney Fees in case 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 12/18/14. Associated Cases: 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN, 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN(GRR)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1108 ORDER AUTHORIZING THE PAYMENT OF FEES INCURRED BY THE RECEIVER THAT WERE NECESSARY TO ASSIST THE RECEIVER IN HIS DUTIES. Granting 1152 Motion for Attorney Fees in case 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN; granting 1099 Motion for Attorney Fees in case 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 10/15/14. Associated Cases: 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN, 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN(GRR)
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1085 ORDER AUTHORIZING THE PAYMENT OF FEES INCURRED BY THE RECEIVERS IN THE ASSOCIATED BANK ACTION THAT WERE NECESSARY TO ASSIST THE RECEIVERS IN THEIR DUTIES. Granting 1126 Motion for Attorney Fees in case 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN; granting 1077 Motion for Attorney Fees in case 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 7/17/14. Associated Cases: 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN, 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN(GRR)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1074 ORDER AUTHORIZING THE PAYMENT OF FEES INCURRED BY THE RECEIVERS IN THE ASSOCIATED BANK ACTION THAT WERE NECESSARY TO ASSIST THE RECEIVERS IN THEIR DUTIES. Granting (1116) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN; granting (1066) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 4/11/14. Associated Cases: 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN, 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN(GRR)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1063 ORDER APPROVING SIXTH INTERIM DISTRIBUTION AND THIRD AMENDED FINAL CLAIMS LIST. Granting 1109 Motion in case 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN; granting 1059 Motion in case 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 1/16/14. Associated Cases: 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN, 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN(GRR)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1056 ORDER AUTHORIZING THE PAYMENT OF FEES INCURRED BY THE RECEIVERS IN THE ASSOCIATED BANK ACTION THAT WERE NECESSARY TO ASSIST THE RECEIVERS IN THEIR DUTIES Granting 1101 Motion for Attorney Fees in case 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN; granting 1052 Motion for Attorney Fees in case 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 12/20/13. Associated Cases: 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN, 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN(GRR)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1048 ORDER AUTHORIZING THE PAYMENT OF FEES INCURRED BY THE RECEIVERS IN THE ASSOCIATED BANK ACTION THAT WERE NECESSARY TO ASSIST THE RECEIVERS IN THEIR DUTIES. Granting 1089 Motion for Attorney Fees in case 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN; granting 1040 Motion for Attorney Fees in case 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 10/4/13. Associated Cases: 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN, 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN(GRR)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1038 ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT WITH ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY. Granting 1084 Motion for Approval of Settlement in case 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN; granting 1035 Motion for Approval of Settlement in case 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 8/12/13. Associated Cases: 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN, 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN(GRR)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1034 ORDER AUTHORIZING THE PAYMENT OF FEES INCURRED BY THE RECEIVERS IN THE ASSOCIATED BANK ACTION THAT WERE NECESSARY TO ASSIST THE RECEIVERS IN THEIR DUTIES. Granting 1078 Motion for Attorney Fees in case 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN; granting 1029 Motion for Attorney Fees in case 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 7/1/13. Associated Cases: 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN, 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN(GRR)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1024 SECOND AMENDED ORDER APPROVING FIFTH INTERIM DISTRIBUTION. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 6/7/13. Associated Cases: 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN, 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN(GRR)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1017 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the Receiver's Motion to Retain Outside Counsel for Purposes of Pursuing Claims Against Third Parties (Case No. 09-cv-3332 1012 ; Case No. 09-cv-3333 1061 , and Case No. 11-cv-0574, 374 ) is GRANTED. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 4/11/13. Associated Cases: 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN, 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN(GRR)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1005 ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT WITH SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE. IT HEREBY ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: 1. The Receiver's motion is GRANTED. 2. The Court approves the Settlement Agreement and Release of All Claims (09-cv-3333 1049 , 09-cv-3332 1001 , and 11-cv-574 355 ) between the Receiver and Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 3/22/13. Associated Cases: 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN, 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN(GRR)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 986 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER.(Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 2/4/13. Associated Cases: 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN, 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN(GRR)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 981 ORDER AUTHORIZING THE PAYMENT OF FEES INCURRED BY THE RECEIVER THAT WERE NECESSARY TO ASSIST THE RECEIVER IN HIS DUTIES. Granting (1024) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN; granting (976) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 1/24/13. Associated Cases: 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN, 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN(GRR)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 975 ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND GRANTING PARTIAL LIFT OF ASSET FREEZE TO PERMIT PAYMENT OF SETTLEMENT in SEC v. Beckman et al., 11-cv-574, Docket No. 335.(Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 1/2/13. Associated Cases: 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN, 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN(GRR)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 974 ORDER AUTHORIZING THE PAYMENT OF FEES INCURRED BY THE RECEIVER THAT WERE NECESSARY TO ASSIST THE RECEIVER IN HIS DUTIES. Granting (1017) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN; granting (969) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 12/14/12. Associated Cases: 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN, 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN(GRR)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 968 ORDER AUTHORIZING THE PAYMENT OF FEES INCURRED BY THE RECEIVER THAT WERE NECESSARY TO ASSIST THE RECEIVER IN HIS DUTIES. Granting (1011) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN; granting (963) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 11/1/12. Associated Cases: 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN, 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN(GRR)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 926 ORDER AUTHORIZING THE PAYMENT OF FEES INCURRED BY THE RECEIVER THAT WERE NECESSARY TO ASSIST THE RECEIVER IN HIS DUTIES. Granting (957) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN; granting (921) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 4/12/12. Associated Cases: 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN, 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN(GRR)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 916 ORDER ENTERING SECOND AMENDED FINAL CLAIMS LIST. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the motion is GRANTED. The Recognized Claim Amounts for the 723 claimants identified in the Receiver's Second Amended Final Claims List, 09-cv-3333 944 , 09-cv -3332 908 & 11-cv-574 Docket No. 273 (Mar. 9, 2012), are hereby entered as the final claim amounts for civil restitution in the civil cases of SEC v. Cook et al., 09-cv-3333 (D. Minn.), CFTC v. Cook et al., 09-cv-3332 (D. Minn.) and SEC v. Beckma n et al., 11-cv-574 (D. Minn.). No other individual or entity shall be entitled to civil restitution in these cases barring further Order of this Court.SO ORDERED.(Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 3/23/12. Associated Cases: 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN, 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN(GRR)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 898 ORDER AUTHORIZING THE PAYMENT OF FEES INCURRED BY THE RECEIVER THAT WERE NECESSARY TO ASSIST THE RECEIVER IN HIS DUTIES. Granting (926) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN; granting (892) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN.(Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 2/24/12. Associated Cases: 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN, 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN(GRR)
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 881 ORDER AUTHORIZING THE PAYMENT OF FEES INCURRED BY THE RECEIVER THAT WERE NECESSARY TO ASSIST THE RECEIVER IN HIS DUTIES. Granting 911 Motion for Attorney Fees in case 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN; and granting 877 Motion for Attorney Fees in case 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 12/15/11. Associated Cases: 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN, 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN(GRR)
November 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 876 ORDER AUTHORIZING THE PAYMENT OF FEES INCURRED BY THE RECEIVER THAT WERE NECESSARY TO ASSIST THE RECEIVER IN HIS DUTIES. Granting (905) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN; granting (871) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN.(Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 11/23/11. Associated Cases: 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN, 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN(GRR)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 869 ORDER AUTHORIZING THE PAYMENT OF FEES INCURRED BY THE RECEIVER THAT WERE NECESSARY TO ASSIST THE RECEIVER IN HIS DUTIES 863 .(Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 10/21/11. (GRR)
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 867 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the Receiver's Motion to Retain Outside Counsel for Purposes of Pursuing Claims Against Third Parties 858 is GRANTED. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 10/19/11. (GRR)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 856 ORDER AUTHORIZING THE PAYMENT OF FEES INCURRED BY THE RECEIVER THAT WERE NECESSARY TO ASSIST THE RECEIVER IN HIS DUTIES 843 .(Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 9/6/11. (GRR)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 838 ORDER AUTHORIZING THE PAYMENT OF FEES INCURRED BY THE RECEIVER THAT WERE NECESSARY TO ASSIST THE RECEIVER IN HIS DUTIES 823 . (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 8/12/11. (GRR)
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 831 ORDER ENTERING FIRST AMENDED FINAL CLAIMS LIST. Granting 848 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings in case 0:09-cv-03333-MJD -FLN; granting 814 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings in case 0:09-cv-03332-MJD -FLN. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 7/22/11. Associated Cases: 0:09-cv-03332-MJD -FLN, 0:09-cv-03333-MJD -FLN(GRR)
June 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 811 ORDER AUTHORIZING THE PAYMENT OF FEES INCURRED BY THE RECEIVER THAT WERE NECESSARY TO ASSIST THE RECEIVER IN HIS DUTIES 795 . (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 6/27/11. (GRR)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 807 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the motion 776 is GRANTED. (1) The Receiver is authorized to conduct a private sale of the real property located at 5463 Brookfield Road, South Haven, Minnesota 55382 in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 2001(b). (2) The Court hereby appoints Marci Segner and Pat Hill, RE/MAX as the realtors for the sale of the South Haven property. (3) Upon reaching an agreement to sell the South Haven property, the Receiver shall publish notice of the sale and file a motion with this Court seeking confirmation of the sale in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 2001(b). (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 6/23/11. (GRR)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 793 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The Court will defer ruling on this motion 731 for ninety (90) days. The parties shall appear before the Court on Friday, September 9, 2011, at 11:00 a.m. to determine whether the Receiver has filed claims against NRP and Western. The $3.4 million settlement proceeds at issue here shall remain in escrow pending the Courts decision on this motion.(Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 6/6/11. (GRR)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 765 ORDER AUTHORIZING THE PAYMENT OF FEES INCURRED BY THE RECEIVER THAT WERE NECESSARY TO ASSIST THE RECEIVER IN HIS DUTIES. Granting 738 Motion for Attorney Fees. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 5/17/11. (GRR)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 715 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is to sever any and all claims arising under the Summary Proceedings referenced in CFTC Doc. No. 354 and SEC Doc. No. 384, assign them to a new case number and randomly assign this new case to an other Judge using the electronic reassignment system. The caption shall read as follows: R.J. Zayed, in his Capacity as Court-Appointed Receiver for Trevor G. Cook et al., Petitioner, v. David Buysse, Steven and Pamela Cheney, Walter Defiel, John D zik, Terry Frahm, Steven and Jenene Fredell, William Harris, Michael Heise, Michael and Cynthia Hillesheim, Larry Hopfenspirger, Steven Kautzman, James McIntosh, George and Karen Morrisset, Reynold Sundstrom, and Dot Anderson, Respondents. The filin g fee is waived under 28 U.S.C. § 1914. This reassignment shall be documented on the record for all parties to reference. Attached as Exhibit A is the list of docket numbers to be transferred into the new case. All new proceedings, hearings an d filings in conjunction with the above referenced Summary Proceedings shall be submitted and filed with the Judge reassigned concerning these matters. The parties shall also refile their objections to the Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Noel [CFTC Doc. No. 643; SEC Doc. No. 696] in the new civil case. The remainder of Civil Nos. 09-3332 and 09-3333 shall remain before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 4/19/11. (GRR)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 687 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 651 Report and Recommendation (Written Opinion). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Kileys motion to dismiss thecomplaint [#547] is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 4/11/11. (KMW)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 683 ORDER ENTERING RECOGNIZED CLAIM AMOUNTS AND APPROVING PROCESS FOR JUDICIAL RESOLUTION OF DISPUTED CLAIMS. Granting 660 Motion. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 4/5/11. (GRR)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 658 ORDER AUTHORIZING THE PAYMENT OF FEES INCURED BY THE RECEIVER THAT WERE NECESSARY TO ASSIST THE RECEIVER IN HIS DUTIES 633 .(Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 3/15/11. (GRR)
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 624 ORDER AUTHORIZING THE PAYMENT OF FEES INCURRED BY THE RECEIVER THAT WERE NECESSARY TO ASSIST THE RECEIVER IN HIS DUTIES 616 . (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 2/4/11. (GRR)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 604 ORDER AUTHORIZING THE PAYMENT OF FEES INCURRED BY THE RECEIVER THAT WERE NECESSARY TO ASSIST THE RECEIVER IN HIS DUTIES. Granting 595 Motion for Attorney Fees. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 1/6/11. (GRR)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 580 ORDER AUTHORIZING THE PAYMENT OF FEES INCURRED BY THE RECEIVER THAT WERE NECESSARY TO ASSIST THE RECEIVER IN HIS DUTIES. 553 (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 12/9/10. (GRR)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 576 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Trevor Cook's Motion to Vacate/Purge Contempt 430 is GRANTED effective November 1, 2010. The Court will retain jurisdiction over this matter and orders Cook to meet and cooperate with the Receiver, the CFTC and the SEC until further Order of this Court. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 12/6/10. (GRR)
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 535 ORDER AUTHORIZING THE PAYMENT OF FEES INCURRED BY THE RECEIVER THAT WERE NECESSARY TO ASSIST THE RECEIVER IN HIS DUTIES 532 . (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 11/9/10. (GRR)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 521 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Trevor Cook's Motion to Vacate/Purge Contempt 430 is DENIED. The SEC, CFTC and the Receiver shall continue to meet with Defendant Cook for purposes of recovering additional investor assets. Prior t o each such interview, the SEC, CFTC and the Receiver shall submit to Defendant Cook's counsel the list of questions that will be asked the Defendant, and the information sought, in order to streamline the interview process. The parties shall appear before the Court for a status conference on December 6, 2010 at 9:00 a.m.(Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 11/1/10. (GRR)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 486 ORDER granting (511) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 0:09-cv-03333-MJD-FLN; granting (467) and Motion for Attorney Fees in case 0:09-cv-03332-MJD-FLN. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 10/8/10. (KMW)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER AUTHORIZING THE PAYMENT OF FEES INCURRED BY THE RECEIVER THAT WERE NECESSARY TO ASSIST THE RECEIVER IN HIS DUTIES. The Receiver's Motion is GRANTED 380 (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 9/3/10. (GRR)
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER AUTHORIZING THE PAYMENT OF FEES INCURRED BY THE RECEIVER THAT WERE NECESSARY TO ASSIST THE RECEIVER IN HIS DUTIES. Granting 356 Motion for Attorney Fees. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 8/6/10. (GRR)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER. Based upon the records, files and proceedings herein, and pursuant to the agreement reached by the Plaintiffs in these actions, the Receiver, and Greene Espel, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Greene Espel's motion is GRANTED; and 2. The Receiver shall cause to be paid from the Receiver Estate the amount of $81,000.00 to Greene Espel P.L.L.P., as its reasonable attorney fees and expenses incurred in the protection and preservation of assets for the Receivership Estate.(Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 8/5/10. (GRR)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER granting Motion to Compel 295 pursuant to the Stipulation 327 executed on June 16, 2010 (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 6/16/10. (GRR)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER. Based on the submissions of the Receiver, the Court hereby appoints Alan Zucchiatti of Rainy Lake Realty Ltd., 540 Kings Highway, Fort Frances, Ontario, P9A2T1 to sell the Rainy Lake Property, formerly identified as Parcel 4178 Rainy River, Island G 1251 containing 2.3 acres situated in Rainy Lake, West of Sand Point Island District of Rainy River. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 6/1/10. (GRR)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER GRANTING RECEIVERS MOTION FOR SALE OF CERTAIN PERSONAL PROPERTY IN ITS POSSESSION. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Receivers Motion For Sale Of Certain Personal Property In Its Possession pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2001 and 28 U.S.C. § 2004 257 is GRANTED (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 5/6/10. (GRR)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 293 AGREED ORDER FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND OTHER ANCILLARY RELIEF AS TO DEFENDANT UNIVERSAL BROKERAGE FX GROWTH, L.P. f/k/a UBS DIVERSIFIED FX GROWTH, L.P. 283 (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 5/5/10. (GRR)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER AUTHORIZING THE PAYMENT OF FEES INCURRED BY THE RECEIVER THAT WERE NECESSARY TO ASSIST THE RECEIVER IN HIS DUTIES 251 (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 4/20/10. (GRR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Trevor Cook, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Represented By: David Slovick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevor Cook
Represented By: Piper Kenney Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Kiley
Represented By: Peter B Wold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxford Global Partners, LLC
Represented By: John R Neve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxford Global Advisors, LLC
Represented By: Barbara P Berens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Brokerage FX Advisors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Brokerage FX Growth L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Brokerage FX Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Diversified Growth LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: The Law Office of William J. Mauzy
Represented By: Christopher W Madel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: William J. Mauzy
Represented By: Christopher W Madel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: R.J. Zayed, Carlson, Caspers, Vandenburgh & Lindquist
Represented By: R J Zayed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?