Rudduck v. Hilleran
Petitioner: Leroy Oliver Rudduck
Respondent: Dan Hilleran
Case Number: 0:2010cv00246
Filed: January 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
County: Carlton
Presiding Judge: Noel
Presiding Judge: Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that: Petitioners Amended Petition Under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody [Docket No. 10] be DENIED. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on December 20, 2010. (jam)
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: 1) Petitioner's Amended Petition Under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody be DENIED; 2) this action be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; and 3) JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. It is f urther recommended, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2253(c), that a Certificate of Appealability not be issued because Petitioner has failed to make a substantial showing of the denial of any constitutional right. Objections to R&R due by 11/12/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 10/28/10. (akl)
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Leroy Oliver Rudduck. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation dated February 10, 2010 [Docket No. 5] is REJECTED in part and ADOPTED in part; 2. The Court REFERS the matter to the Magistrate Judge for further consideration.(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on March 24, 2010. (HAM)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re 8 Letter to Magistrate Judge filed by Leroy Oliver Rudduck. Petitioner's request for an extension of time to respond to the Report andRecommendation [Docket No. 8] is GRANTED. Petitioner's objections to the Report and Recommendation are due on March 10, 2010.(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on February 19, 2010. (HAM)
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that this action be summarily DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, unless, before the deadline for filing objections to this Report and Recommendation, Petitioner files an amended habeas corpus petition listing only his fully exhausted claim(s). Objections to R&R due by 2/24/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 2/10/10. (kt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rudduck v. Hilleran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Leroy Oliver Rudduck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dan Hilleran
Represented By: Todd P Zettler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?