Titlecraft, Inc. v. National Football League et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Titlecraft, Inc.
Defendant: National Football League and NFL Properties, LLC
Case Number: 0:2010cv00758
Filed: March 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J. Keyes
Presiding Judge: Richard H. Kyle
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2011 Filing 46 JUDGMENT re: 45 ORDER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Notice - appeal, # 2 Civil-8th Circuit Pre-Hearing Conference Notice)(LPH)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER that this action is dismissed with prejudice re 44 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 02/01/11. (kll)
January 28, 2011 Filing 44 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by NFL Properties, LLC, National Football League, Titlecraft, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Connolly, Daniel)
January 20, 2011 Filing 43 AMENDED JUDGMENT (Attachments: # 1 Civil Notice - appeal, # 2 Civil-8th Circuit Pre-Hearing Conference Notice)(LPH)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 AMENDED FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT ON CONSENT. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 01/19/11. (kll)
January 19, 2011 Filing 41 JUDGMENT (Attachments: # 1 Civil Notice - appeal, # 2 Civil-8th Circuit Pre-Hearing Conference Notice)(LPH)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT OF CONSENT dismissing this action. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 01/19/11. (kll)
January 18, 2011 Filing 39 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 1/18/2011. Settlement reached. Terms stated on the record. (Tape #01-18-11 6:24-6:32) (MMP)
January 5, 2011 Filing 38 *TEXT ONLY ENTRY* NOTICE of Resetting of Settlement/Status Conference: 37 Settlement/Status Conference set for 1/4/2011 reset for 1/18/2011 12:30 PM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. (JEP)
December 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 1/4/2011 10:30 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 646 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 12/29/10. (LPH)
December 27, 2010 Filing 36 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 12/17/2010 before Judge Richard H. Kyle. (21 pages). Court Reporter: Ron Moen (E-mail: Ron_Moen@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (651) 848-1222). Redaction Request due 1/17/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/27/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/28/2011. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (RJM)
December 27, 2010 Filing 35 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. A total of 1 transcripts are associated with this filing. (RJM)
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 19 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Titlecraft's liability for copyright infringement (Count I of the NFL's Counterclaims); the remaining claims in this case, and the damages for which Titlecraft is liable, remain for resolution on another day; the parties are directed to contact Magistrate Judge Keyes to schedule a settlement conference in the event they are unable to resolve this matter on their own. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 12/20/10. (kll)
December 17, 2010 Filing 33 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard H. Kyle: Motion Hearing held on 12/17/2010 re 19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by NFL Properties, LLC, National Football League argued and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Ron Moen) (ds)
December 3, 2010 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NFL Properties, LLC, National Football League re 30 Response in Support of Motion, 31 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate (Cruz, Timothy)
December 3, 2010 Filing 31 LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by NFL Properties, LLC, National Football League re 30 Response in Support of Motion filed by NFL Properties, LLC, National Football League. (Cruz, Timothy)
December 3, 2010 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Support re 19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by NFL Properties, LLC, National Football League. (Cruz, Timothy)
November 26, 2010 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Titlecraft, Inc. re 27 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, 25 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 28 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 26 Declaration in Support (Seurer, Justin)
November 26, 2010 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT of Ed Reichow in OPPOSITION TO 19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Titlecraft, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Affidavit of Ed Reichow pg.2, # 2 Exhibit(s) Figure 1 from Affidavit of Ed Reichow, # 3 Exhibit(s) Figure 2 of Affidavit of Ed Reichow)(Seurer, Justin) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/29/2010 because it was originally scanned in upside down) (lph).
November 26, 2010 Filing 27 LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Titlecraft, Inc. re 25 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Titlecraft, Inc.. (Seurer, Justin)
November 26, 2010 Filing 26 Declaration of Justin L Seurer in Support of 25 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Titlecraft, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Opinion Letter)(Seurer, Justin)
November 26, 2010 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Titlecraft, Inc.. (Seurer, Justin)
October 15, 2010 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NFL Properties, LLC, National Football League re 20 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 23 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, 22 Declaration in Support, 19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 21 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Cruz, Timothy)
October 15, 2010 Filing 23 LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by NFL Properties, LLC, National Football League re 21 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by NFL Properties, LLC, National Football League. (Cruz, Timothy)
October 15, 2010 Filing 22 Declaration of Daniel J. Connolly in Support of 19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by NFL Properties, LLC, National Football League. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E, # 6 Exhibit(s) F, # 7 Exhibit(s) G, # 8 Exhibit(s) H, # 9 Exhibit(s) I, # 10 Exhibit(s) J, # 11 Exhibit(s) K, # 12 Exhibit(s) L, # 13 Exhibit(s) M)(Cruz, Timothy)
October 15, 2010 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re 19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by NFL Properties, LLC, National Football League. (Cruz, Timothy)
October 15, 2010 Filing 20 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Richard H. Kyle. (Cruz, Timothy)
October 15, 2010 Filing 19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by NFL Properties, LLC, National Football League. (Cruz, Timothy)
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 9/30/2010. Discovery due by 2/28/2011. Motions (non-disp) due 2/28/2011. Motions (disp) due by 7/1/2011. Ready for trial due by 10/1/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 08/17/2010. (MMP)
August 17, 2010 Filing 17 Minute Entry: Pretrial Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 8/17/2010. Pretrial Scheduling Order to be issued. (MMP)
August 6, 2010 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by NFL Properties, LLC, National Football League, Titlecraft, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Connolly, Daniel)
July 14, 2010 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NFL Properties, LLC, National Football League re 14 MOTION to Withdraw 9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Counterclaims, 10 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 11 APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (Cruz, Timothy)
July 14, 2010 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw 9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Counterclaims, 10 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 11 APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT by NFL Properties, LLC, National Football League. (Cruz, Timothy)
July 13, 2010 Filing 13 Plaintiff REPLY to Counterclaim of Defendants by Titlecraft, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Seurer, Justin)
July 12, 2010 Filing 12 Declaration of Timothy J. Cruz in Support of 11 APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT filed by NFL Properties, LLC, National Football League. (Cruz, Timothy)
July 12, 2010 Filing 11 APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Cruz, Timothy)
July 12, 2010 Filing 10 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Counterclaims : Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2010 08:15 AM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Richard H. Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Cruz, Timothy)
July 12, 2010 Filing 9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Counterclaims by NFL Properties, LLC, National Football League. (Cruz, Timothy)
July 2, 2010 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION 8 PRETRIAL NOTICE - DUPLICATE ENTRY. (MMP)
July 1, 2010 Filing 8 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-DUPLICATE ENTRY-NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(MMP) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2010: # 2 Document filed in error- Duplicate Entry) (MMP).
July 1, 2010 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 8/17/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(MMP)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ENTRY - ORDER granting 4 , 5 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorneys Bruce P. Keller and Michael J. Beam for NFL Properties, LLC and National Football League. Fees paid; receipt number 3-007174. Approved by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 6/7/10. (MMC)
June 4, 2010 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NFL Properties, LLC, National Football League re 3 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Michael J. Beam, 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Bruce P. Keller (Connolly, Daniel)
June 4, 2010 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Michael J. Beam by NFL Properties, LLC, National Football League. (Connolly, Daniel)
June 4, 2010 Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Bruce P. Keller by NFL Properties, LLC, National Football League. (Connolly, Daniel)
June 4, 2010 Filing 3 COUNTERCLAIMS AND ANSWER to Complaint of Defendants, COUNTERCLAIM against Titlecraft, Inc. by NFL Properties, LLC, National Football League. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1, # 2 Exhibit(s) 2, # 3 Exhibit(s) 3, # 4 Exhibit(s) 4, # 5 Exhibit(s) 5, # 6 Exhibit(s) 6, # 7 Exhibit(s) 7, # 8 Exhibit(s) 8, # 9 Exhibit(s) 9) (Connolly, Daniel)
May 28, 2010 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Titlecraft, Inc.. NFL Properties, LLC waiver sent on 4/5/2010, answer due 6/4/2010; National Football League waiver sent on 4/5/2010, answer due 6/4/2010. (Seurer, Justin)
March 11, 2010 Summons Issued as to NFL Properties, LLC, National Football League. (VEM)
March 11, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NFL Properties, LLC, National Football League ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4-43175.) assigned to Judge Richard H. Kyle per Master List referred to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes, filed by Titlecraft, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (VEM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Titlecraft, Inc. v. National Football League et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Titlecraft, Inc.
Represented By: Justin L Seurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Football League
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFL Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?