National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA et al v. Donaldson Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA and American Home Assurance Company
Defendant: Donaldson Company, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Donaldson Company, Inc.
Counter_defendant: American Home Assurance Company and National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Case Number: 0:2010cv04948
Filed: December 21, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Arthur J. Boylan
Presiding Judge: John R. Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 547 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 498 Defendant Donaldson Company, Inc.'s Motion to Alter/Amend/Correct Judgment under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 52(b) and 54(d)(2) to add attorney fees and expenses. (Written Opinion) Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 5/16/2018. (HAZ)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 496 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 485 Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Judgment. (Written Opinion) Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 12/06/2017. (JMK)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 483 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION AND ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment on Donaldson's Counterclaim 459 . (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 08/23/2017. (JMK)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 387 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Donaldson Company's 377 Motion for 54(b) Certification. Donaldson Company's 375 request for additional discovery on Donaldson's counterclaim is GRANTED (Written Opinion) Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on August 17, 2015. (DML)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 369 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER 1. Granting defendant Federal Insurance Company's 278 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Samuel J. Ward; 2. Denying defendant Federal Insurance Company's [28 6] Motion for Summary Judgment; 3. Granting defendant Donaldson's 288 Motion to Exclude Testimony from Chris Okey and Paul Nugent; 4. Denying plaintiffs' 295 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; 5. Denying p laintiffs' 306 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; 6. Granting in part and denying in part defendant Donaldson's 275 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Motion granted as to the request that the Court enter a declara tory judgment that there were two lots of Donaldson's products and that Donaldson received notice of the underlying property damage during the 1999-2000 policy period. Motion denied as to the request that the Court determine that Donaldson's deductible contribution obligations have been fulfilled or are capped at a particular additional amount. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on March 23, 2015. (DML)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 274 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER 1) Overruling plaintiffs' 197 objection. Affirming 194 Order of the Magistrate Judge dated April 29, 2013. 2) Overruling National Union's 200 objection. Affirming 195 Or der of the Magistrate Judge dated April 29, 2013. 3) Overruling defendant Federal Insurance Company's 262 objection. Affirming 260 Order of the Magistrate Judge dated December 23, 2013. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on June 24, 2014. (DML)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 196 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Reversing 160 District Court Decision; sustaining plaintiffs' 173 Objection of Magistrate Judge's Decision to District Judge; DENYING defendant Donaldson's 142 motion to compel production of documents by plaintiff (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on May 6, 2013. (DML)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying without prejudice defendant Donaldson Company's 14 Motion for Summary Judgment and Partial Summary Judgment; denying without prejudice plaintiffs American Home Assuranc e Company and National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA's 29 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying with prejudice defendant Federal Insurance Company's 97 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying without prejudice defendant Federal Insurance Company's 97 Motion for Summary Judgment (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on March 30, 2012. (DML)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA et al v. Donaldson Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: Matthew J Fink
Represented By: Michael P McNamee
Represented By: Cody S Moon
Represented By: Kelly L Stoltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Home Assurance Company
Represented By: Matthew J Fink
Represented By: Michael P McNamee
Represented By: Cody S Moon
Represented By: Kelly L Stoltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donaldson Company, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret S Brownell
Represented By: Gary J Haugen
Represented By: Bradley M Orschel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Donaldson Company, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret S Brownell
Represented By: Gary J Haugen
Represented By: Bradley M Orschel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: American Home Assurance Company
Represented By: Matthew J Fink
Represented By: Michael P McNamee
Represented By: Cody S Moon
Represented By: Kelly L Stoltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: Matthew J Fink
Represented By: Michael P McNamee
Represented By: Cody S Moon
Represented By: Kelly L Stoltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?