Gurman et al v. Metro Housing and Redevelopment Authority et al
Plaintiff: Mikhail Gurman, Ester Kruglyak, Valeriy Babushkin, Svetlana Babushkina, Svetlana Barskiy, Rada Shevtsov and Vicro Home Care, Inc.
Defendant: Defendant Y, Defendant Z, Carver County Community Development Agency, Tamara M. Peters, Mary G. Dobbins, Therese A. Smith, Beth A. Reetz, Kathleen M. Shea, Allison Streich, Landrum and Dobbins, LLC, Defendant X, Metro Housing and Redevelopment Authority and Metropolitan Council
Case Number: 0:2011cv00228
Filed: January 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Hennepin
Presiding Judge: Jeanne J. Graham
Presiding Judge: Patrick J. Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting 103 Motion to Establish Attorney's Lien. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The motion of Skolnick & Shiff, P.A. to establish an attorney's lien against the funds paid by defendants to plaintiffs in settlement of this litiga tion 103 is GRANTED. 2. A lien in the amount of $10,419.50 is established in favor of Skolnick & Shiff, P.A. against the property of plaintiffs currently in the possession of Skolnick & Shiff, P.A. 3. Skolnick & Shiff, P.A. may enforce the lien immediately upon entry of this order and without further proceedings before this Court. LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on October 19, 2012. (clg)
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER - The Metro HRA Defendants shall recover $15,000.00 in attorney's fees from the law firm of Saliterman & Siefferman, PC, under 28 U.S.C. Section 1927. The Dobbins Defendants' motion for sanctions 45 is GRANTED IN PART, as foll ows: The Dobbins Defendants shall recover $15,000.00 from the law firm of Saliterman & Siefferman, PC, under Fed. R. Civ. P. 11. The Dobbins Defendants' motion is DENIED in all other respects. Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney's Fees 91 is GRANTED IN PART, as follows: Plaintiffs shall recover $30,000.00 in attorney's fees and costs from the Metro HRA Defendants. Plaintiffs' motion is DENIED in all other respects. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 08/07/12. (bjs)
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 2/1/2012. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 01/13/12. (Written Opinion) (bjs) Modified on 1/13/2012 (akl).
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER - The motion of defendants Metro Housing and Redevelopment Authority, Metropolitan Council, Tamara M. Peters, Therese A. Smith, Beth A. Reetz, and Kathleen M. Shea to dismiss 11 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The motion of defendants Mary G. D obbins and Landrum and Dobbins, LLC to dismiss 13 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The motion of defendants Carver County Community Development Agency and Allison Streich to dismiss 15 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs' first amended com plaint 9 will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with Rule 8 on July 29, 2011. If plaintiffs wish to continue to litigate their claims in federal court, they must, by July 29, 2011, file a second amended complaint that complies with the directives set forth above. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 06/30/11. (bjs)
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER - The motion of defendants Metro Housing and Redevelopment Authority, Metropolitan Council, Tamara M. Peters, Therese A. Smith, Beth A. Reetz, and Kathleen M. Shea to dismiss 11 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The motion of defendants Mary G. D obbins and Landrum and Dobbins, LLC to dismiss 13 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The motion of defendants Carver County Community Development Agency and Allison Streich to dismiss 15 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs' first amended com plaint 9 will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with Rule 8 on July 29, 2011. If plaintiffs wish to continue to litigate their claims in federal court, they must, by July 29, 2011, file a second amended complaint that complies with the directives set forth above. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 06/29/11. (bjs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gurman et al v. Metro Housing and Redevelopment Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant Y
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carver County Community Development Agency
Represented By: James R Andreen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamara M. Peters
Represented By: Anthony G Edwards
Represented By: Andrew D Parker
Represented By: Tammy L Pust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary G. Dobbins
Represented By: John M. LeFevre, Jr
Represented By: Peter G Mikhail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Therese A. Smith
Represented By: Anthony G Edwards
Represented By: Andrew D Parker
Represented By: Tammy L Pust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth A. Reetz
Represented By: Anthony G Edwards
Represented By: Andrew D Parker
Represented By: Tammy L Pust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen M. Shea
Represented By: Anthony G Edwards
Represented By: Andrew D Parker
Represented By: Tammy L Pust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Streich
Represented By: James R Andreen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landrum and Dobbins, LLC
Represented By: John M. LeFevre, Jr
Represented By: Peter G Mikhail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro Housing and Redevelopment Authority
Represented By: Tammy L Pust
Represented By: Andrew D Parker
Represented By: Anthony G Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Council
Represented By: Tammy L Pust
Represented By: Andrew D Parker
Represented By: Anthony G Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikhail Gurman
Represented By: Richard A Saliterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ester Kruglyak
Represented By: Richard A Saliterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valeriy Babushkin
Represented By: Richard A Saliterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Svetlana Babushkina
Represented By: Richard A Saliterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Svetlana Barskiy
Represented By: Richard A Saliterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rada Shevtsov
Represented By: Richard A Saliterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicro Home Care, Inc.
Represented By: Richard A Saliterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?