IBEW Local 98 Pension Fund v. Best Buy Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: IBEW Local 98 Pension Fund
Defendant: Best Buy Co., Inc., Brian J Dunn, Jim Muehlbauer and Mike Vitelli
Movant: Marion Haynes
Case Number: 0:2011cv00429
Filed: February 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Donovan W. Frank
Presiding Judge: Franklin L. Noel
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 342 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. No. 329 ) is GRANTED and Plaintiffs' claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 3/8/2019. (las)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER: Lead Plaintiff's objection (Doc. No. [317) of Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel's July 11, 2018 Order is OVERRULED. Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel's July 11, 2018 Order (Doc. No. 311 ) is AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 8/24/2018. (las)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER denying 213 Motion to Compel; denying 284 Motion (Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 7/11/2018. (TMA)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 282 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Plaintiffs' Request to File a New Motion for Class Certification (Doc. No. 267 ) is DENIED.(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 6/23/2017. (BJS)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 223 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Defendants' Expedited Motion to Stay Proceedings (Doc. No. 202 ) is GRANTED. Defendants shall notify the Court of the resolution of their Rule 23(f) petition within one week of their receipt of the Eighth Circuit's decision.(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 9/11/2014. (BJS)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 188 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. 1. Defendants' motion with respect to Plaintiffs' claim against Vitelli as a primary violator is GRANTED and that claim is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; 2. Defendants' motion with respect to Plaintiffs' claim against Vitelli as a control person is DENIED; and 3. Defendants' motion to strike pursuant to Rule 12(f) is DENIED. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 4/30/2014. (BJS)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER denying 85 Motion to Certify Interlocutory Appeal and denying 80 Defendants' request for leave to file a motion for reconsideration(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 12/19/2013. (RLB)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 65 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART consistent with the memorandum above. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 8/5/2013. (BJS)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting in part 43 Motion to Alter/Amend/Correct Judgment. Judgment in this case is vacated and the Court grants Plaintiffs leave to file their [Proposed] First Amended Class Action Complaint For Violation of the Federal Securities Laws [46-1] within seven (7) days of this Order. (Written Opinion.) Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 10/22/2012. (rlb)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. 1. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 27 ) is GRANTED. 2. Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 25 ) is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 3/20/2012. (BJS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IBEW Local 98 Pension Fund v. Best Buy Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW Local 98 Pension Fund
Represented By: Steven-NA F Marino
Represented By: Darren-NA J. Robbins
Represented By: Vernon J Vander Weide
Represented By: David - NA C Walton
Represented By: Shawn A Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Buy Co., Inc.
Represented By: David W Beehler
Represented By: Michael V Ciresi
Represented By: Amelia N Jadoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian J Dunn
Represented By: David W Beehler
Represented By: Michael V Ciresi
Represented By: Amelia N Jadoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Muehlbauer
Represented By: David W Beehler
Represented By: Michael V Ciresi
Represented By: Amelia N Jadoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Vitelli
Represented By: David W Beehler
Represented By: Michael V Ciresi
Represented By: Amelia N Jadoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Marion Haynes
Represented By: Vernon J Vander Weide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?