George v. Uponor, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Tim George
Defendant: Uponor, Inc., Wirsbo Company and Uponor Wirsbo, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2012cv00249
Filed: January 31, 2012
Court: Minnesota District Court
Office: DMN Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Jeffrey J. Keyes
Presiding Judge: Ann D. Montgomery
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2015 276 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 222 Unopposed Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement on Behalf of Uponor and Materially Contributing Entities (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 09/09/2015. (TLU)
June 12, 2015 248 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 246 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND GRANTING 223 JOINT MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND APPROVAL OF FORM AND DISSEMINATION OF CLASS NOTICE (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 6/12/15. (JME)
June 11, 2015 246 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - Based on its review of the pleadings, memoranda, affidavits, and arguments of counsel, this Court concludes, for the reasons set out in the proposed Order attached to this Report and Recommendation, that: this case should be provisionally and conditionally certified, subject to final approval of the settlement in conjunction with the final fairness hearing, as a class action, for settlement purposes only, pursuant Rule 23(b)(3) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; the proposed settlement class should be approved; the proposed settlement is fair, reasonable, and adequate; and the form, method and content of the class notice should be approved. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 6/11/2015. (KNK)
April 14, 2014 181 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 172 Defendant Uponor Corporation's Motion to Reconsider (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 04/14/2014. (TLU)
December 23, 2013 155 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 107 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 131 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 12/23/2013. (TLU)
February 28, 2013 79 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 60 Movants Curtis and Tina Smith's Motion for Leave to File Reply; denying 33 Movants Curtis and Tina Smith's Motion to Intervene (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 02/28/2013. (TLU)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George v. Uponor, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim George
Represented By: Shanon-NA J. Carson
Represented By: Charles-NA J. LaDuca
Represented By: Eric N Linsk
Represented By: Patrick-NA H. Madden
Represented By: Michael-NA A. McShane
Represented By: Shawn M Raiter
Represented By: Charles E Schaffer
Represented By: Robert K Shelquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uponor, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel W Berglund
Represented By: Howard-NA L. Lieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wirsbo Company
Represented By: Daniel W Berglund
Represented By: Howard-NA L. Lieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uponor Wirsbo, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel W Berglund
Represented By: Howard-NA L. Lieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?