American Institute of Physics et al v. Schwegman, Lundberg & Woessner, P.A. et al
Plaintiff: American Institute of Physics and John Wiley & Sons, Inc.
Defendant: Schwegman, Lundberg & Woessner, P.A. and John Doe Nos. 1-10
Case Number: 0:2012cv00528
Filed: February 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J. Keyes
Presiding Judge: Richard H. Kyle
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER Adopting 250 Report and Recommendation; overruling 252 Objections; denying as moot 93 Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 116 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying as moot 153 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting 156 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 160 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony; denying as moot 190 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony; denying as moot 222 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony; dismissing with prejudice 41 Amended Complaint. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 08/30/13. (KLL)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 23 Motion to Intervene. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 07/11/12. (kll)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER CANCELING the June 27, 2012 hearing on 11 MOTION to Dismiss. The Motion is deemed submitted as of Juen 13, 2012. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 06/19/12. (kll)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Institute of Physics et al v. Schwegman, Lundberg & Woessner, P.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Institute of Physics
Represented By: Timothy J Pramas
Represented By: William - NA Dunnegan
Represented By: Michelle Kreidler Dove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wiley & Sons, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle Kreidler Dove
Represented By: William - NA Dunnegan
Represented By: Timothy J Pramas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schwegman, Lundberg & Woessner, P.A.
Represented By: Robert - NA Clarida
Represented By: Devan V Padmanabhan
Represented By: Sri K Sankaran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Nos. 1-10
Represented By: Robert - NA Clarida
Represented By: Sri K Sankaran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?