United States of America v. Thornton

Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Crisandra J. Thornton
Case Number: 0:2013mc00086
Filed: October 25, 2013
Court: Minnesota District Court
Office: DMN Office
County: Hennepin
Referring Judge: Tony N. Leung
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: IRS-Third Party
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying (26) Motion To Strike OrderTo Strike Order in case 0:13-mc-00086-SRN-TNL; denying (29) Motion To Strike OrderTo Strike Order in case 0:13-mc-00087-SRN-TNL (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 09/23/2014. Associated Cases: 0:13-mc-00086-SRN-TNL, 0:13-mc-00087-SRN-TNL(SMD)
August 28, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying (22) Motion to Reconsider; denying (22) Motion to Vacate Order; denying (23) Motion in case 0:13-mc-00086-SRN-TNL; denying (26) Motion; denying (25) Motion to Reconsider; denying (25) Motion to Vacate Order in case 0:13-mc-00087-SRN-TNL (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 08/28/2014. Associated Cases: 0:13-mc-00086-SRN-TNL, 0:13-mc-00087-SRN-TNL(SMD)
August 1, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying (5) Motion to Dismiss/General; Adopting (17) Report and Recommendation; granting (1) Petition to Enforce Summons in case 0:13-mc-00086-SRN-TNL; denying (5) Motion to Dismiss/General; denying (14) Motion to Dismiss/General; Adopting (21) Report and Recommendation; granting (1) Petition to Enforce Summons in case 0:13-mc-00087-SRN-TNL. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 08/01/2014. Associated Cases: 0:13-mc-00086-SRN-TNL, 0:13-mc-00087-SRN-TNL(SMD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: D Gerald Wilhelm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Crisandra J. Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?