Johnson et al v. Charps Welding & Fabricating, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Glen Johnson, Timothy Gillen, Kyle Jones, Steven Hall, Clayton Johnson, Mark Hubbard, Steve Piper, Bill Patt, Michael R. Fanning, Joseph Ryan, Bruce Carlson, Frank Frattalone, Lee Hiller, Tony Phillippi, Greg Waffensmith, Mark Ryan, The Operating Engineers Local #49 Health and Welfare Fund, The Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers and Participating Employers and The Local #49 International Union of Operating Engineers and Associated General Contractors of Minnesota Apprenticeship and Training Program
Defendant: Charps Welding & Fabricating, Inc., Clearwater Energy Group, Inc., C & G Construction Inc. of Clearbrook, Alpha Oil & Gas Services, Inc. and Kenneth Charpentier
Case Number: 0:2014cv02081
Filed: June 23, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Hennepin
Presiding Judge: Leo I. Brisbois
Presiding Judge: Richard H. Kyle
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1131
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER granting 316 Defendants' Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 346 Plaintiffs' Motion for Review of Taxation of Costs. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 12/28/2018. (JEP)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 341 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs 316 is GRANTED. (Written Opinion) Signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on 10/4/2018. (LLM)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 311 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 247 is GRANTED; 2. Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment 269 is DENIED; 3. Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Craig Siiro 273 is DENIED as moot; and 4. The Complaint 1 is DISMISSED with prejudice. LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. (Written Opinion) Signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on 8/20/2018. (LLM)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER ADOPTING 218 Report and Recommendation; OVERRULING 220 and 221 Objections; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 169 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Written Opinion). Signed by Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 10/2/17. (KLL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Charps Welding & Fabricating, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Johnson
Represented By: Amy L Court
Represented By: Amy L Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Gillen
Represented By: Amy L Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Jones
Represented By: Amy L Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Hall
Represented By: Amy L Court
Represented By: Carl S Wosmek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayton Johnson
Represented By: Amy L Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Hubbard
Represented By: Amy L Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Piper
Represented By: Amy L Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Patt
Represented By: Amy L Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael R. Fanning
Represented By: Amy L Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Ryan
Represented By: Amy L Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Carlson
Represented By: Amy L Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Frattalone
Represented By: Amy L Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Hiller
Represented By: Amy L Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Phillippi
Represented By: Amy L Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Waffensmith
Represented By: Amy L Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Ryan
Represented By: Amy L Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Operating Engineers Local #49 Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Amy L Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers and Participating Employers
Represented By: Amy L Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Local #49 International Union of Operating Engineers and Associated General Contractors of Minnesota Apprenticeship and Training Program
Represented By: Amy L Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charps Welding & Fabricating, Inc.
Represented By: Martin D Kappenman
Represented By: Thomas R Revnew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clearwater Energy Group, Inc.
Represented By: Martin D Kappenman
Represented By: Thomas R Revnew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C & G Construction Inc. of Clearbrook
Represented By: Martin D Kappenman
Represented By: Thomas R Revnew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpha Oil & Gas Services, Inc.
Represented By: Martin D Kappenman
Represented By: Thomas R Revnew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Charpentier
Represented By: Martin D Kappenman
Represented By: Thomas R Revnew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?