Candella, LLC et al v. Liown Electronics Co. Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Candella, LLC and Luminara Worldwide, LLC
Defendant: Liown Electronics Co. Ltd., Liown Technologies/Beauty Electronics, LLC and Shenzhen Liown Electronics Co. Ltd.
Case Number: 0:2014cv03103
Filed: August 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Presiding Judge: Franklin L. Noel
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 800 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: 1. To the extent the issues raised in Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc. No. 501] have not been otherwise disposed of, Plaintiff's Motion is DENIED without prejudice; 2. The parties shall refile the ir summary judgment memoranda in accordance with the instructions and schedule provided in this Order; 3. Defendants' request for a hearing to consider the effect on the motions for summary judgment of Dr. Brown's substitution for Mr. Patto n [Doc. No. 739] is DENIED; 4. Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction [Doc. No. 635] is DENIED without prejudice; 5. Plaintiff's request for leave to refile its motion for preliminary injunction [Doc. No. 737] is GRANTED; 6. The Court DEFERS ruling on Defendants' request for fees and costs [Doc. NO. 739]; and 7. Defendants' Daubert Motion Against Plaintiff's Expert Stuart Brown [Doc. No. 489] is GRANTED in part and DENIED without prejudice in part. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 03/03/2017. (SMD)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 755 ORDER granting 460 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 2/6/2017. (ADC)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 225 REDACTED Version of 210 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER filed on May 22, 2015. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (SMD)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 164 REDACTED Version of 147 Memorandum Opinion and Order Filed on April 20, 2015 (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 05/01/2015. (SMD)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 149 REDACTED version of Memorandum Opinion and Order Filed on April 3, 2015 at ECF Docket No. 143. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 04/03/2015. (SMD)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER The Court hereby orders parties in the above-captioned matters to submit briefing to address the effect of the Candella, LLC-Luminara Worldwide, LLC merger, if any, on the pending motions before the Court in Case No. 14-cv-3103 and Case No. 14- cv-3112. The brief by counsel for Candella, LLC, and Luminara Worldwide, LLC in Case No. 14-cv-3103 (SRN/FLN), and Luminara Worldwide, LLC, Michael O. Shaughnessy, John W. Jacobson, QVC, Inc., and Darice, Inc. in Case No. 14-cv-3112 (SRN/FLN) shall b e filed no later than January 28, 2015. The response brief by counsel for Liown Electronics Co. Ltd., et al. in Case No. 14-cv-3103 (SRN/FLN), and Shenzhen Liown Electronic Co., Ltd. in Case No. 14-cv-3112 (SRN/FLN) shall be filed no later than February 11, 2015. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 01/14/2015. Associated Cases: 0:14-cv-03103-SRN-FLN, 0:14-cv-03112-SRN-FLN(ILV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Candella, LLC et al v. Liown Electronics Co. Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candella, LLC
Represented By: Joseph W Anthony
Represented By: Daniel R Hall
Represented By: Courtland C Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luminara Worldwide, LLC
Represented By: Joseph W Anthony
Represented By: Daniel R Hall
Represented By: Courtland C Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liown Electronics Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liown Technologies/Beauty Electronics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Liown Electronics Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?