Rescap Liquidating Trust v. Cadence Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: ResCap Liquidating Trust
Defendant: Cadence Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 0:2014cv03946
Filed: September 25, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Davis
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0157
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 146 AMENDED ORDER re 90 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Cadence Bank, N.A. (Amended to correct error in docket number.) Signed by Judge Paul A. Magnuson on June 9, 2015. (ALT)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER denying 90 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. Signed by The Honorable Paul A. Magnuson on 6/4/2015. (APK)
December 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND CADENCES DEADLINE TO FILE ANSWER OR OTHER RESPONSE TO AMENDED COMPLAINT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT:1. The parties' stipulation to extend Cadence's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint is GRANTED 64 . 2. Cadence shall have until January 23, 2015, to answer or otherwise respond to RLTs Amended Complaint. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 12/24/14. (GRR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rescap Liquidating Trust v. Cadence Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ResCap Liquidating Trust
Represented By: Peter E. Calamari
Represented By: David Elsberg
Represented By: Donald G Heeman
Represented By: Jeffrey A Lipps
Represented By: Jessica J Nelson
Represented By: Isaac Nesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cadence Bank, N.A.
Represented By: W Anders Folk
Represented By: Sharon Robin Markowitz
Represented By: Todd A Noteboom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?