Rembrandt Enterprises, Inc. v. Illinois Union Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Rembrandt Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: Illinois Union Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2015cv02913
Filed: July 1, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard H. Kyle
Presiding Judge: Franklin L. Noel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Rembrandt's Motion in Limine 222 is DENIED; 2. Rembrandt's Motion in Limine 233 is GRANTED; 3. Illinois Union's Motion in Limine 235 is DENIED as moot; 4. Illinois Union's Motion in Limin e 238 is DENIED as moot; 5. Illinois Union's Motion in Limine 239 is GRANTED; 6. Illinois Union's Motion in Limine 237 is GRANTED; 7. Illinois Union's Motion in Limine 240 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; 8. Illinois Unio n's Motion in Limine 241 is DENIED; 9. Illinois Union's Motion in Limine 242 is GRANTED in part; and 10. Illinois Union's Motion in Limine 243 is GRANTED. (Written Opinion) Signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on 11/30/2017. (LLM)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 156 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Motion is GRANTED with respect to Rembrandts claim for heating expenses, and any claim to recover those expenses as remediation costs is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. In all other respects, Illinois Unions Motion is DENIED. (Written Opinion). Signed by Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 9/12/17. (KLL)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER denying 100 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 111 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 1/12/17. (KLL)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying 13 Motion to Dismiss or Transfer. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 09/16/15. (KLL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rembrandt Enterprises, Inc. v. Illinois Union Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rembrandt Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Alain M Baudry
Represented By: Harry N Niska
Represented By: Matthew R. Veenstra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Union Insurance Company
Represented By: Stacy A Broman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?