Inline Packaging, LLC v. Graphic Packaging International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Inline Packaging, LLC
Defendant: Graphic Packaging International, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2015cv03183
Filed: July 31, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Mille Lacs
Presiding Judge: Leo I. Brisbois
Presiding Judge: Ann D. Montgomery
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1077 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 1066 Motion for Review of Taxation of Costs ; granting in part and denying in part 1068 Motion for Review of Taxation of Costs, as set forth in the order.(Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 7/26/2019. (LPH)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1064 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Adopting 1061 Report and Recommendation; Plaintiff's Objection 1062 is OVERRULED; denying 1047 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 3/6/2019. (TLU)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER overruling 116 Defendant's OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 01/05/2017. (TLU)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Inline Packaging, LLC v. Graphic Packaging International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inline Packaging, LLC
Represented By: Justice Ericson Lindell
Represented By: Brent A Lorentz
Represented By: Robert R Weinstine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graphic Packaging International, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda Norris Ames
Represented By: Felicia J Boyd
Represented By: David B. Hamilton
Represented By: Jason C. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?