Willis Electric Co., Ltd. v. Polygroup Limited et al
Plaintiff: Willis Electric Co., Ltd.
Defendant: Polygroup Limited (Macao Commerical Offshore), Polygroup Macau Limited (BVI) and Polytree (H.K) Co. Ltd.
Case Number: 0:2015cv03443
Filed: August 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Steven E. Rau
Presiding Judge: Donovan W. Frank
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 606 ORDER granting 595 Joint Motion Regarding Continued Sealing. Permanent Sealing GRANTED for Document Number(s): 553, 555, 557, 557-1, 557-2, 557,-3, 557-4, 557-5, 557-6, 557-7, 557-8, 557-9, 557-10, 557-11, 557-12, 557-13, 557-14, 557-15, 557-16 , 557-17, 557-18, 557-19, 557-20, 563, 565, 568, 570, 572, 572-1, 572-2, 572-3, 572-4, and 578. Order on continued sealing becomes final on 3/30/2021 unless further timely submissions are filed.(Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 3/2/2021. (BJP)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 598 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 551 Motion to Compel; denying 561 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings; denying 576 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings. (Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 2/16/2021. (BJP)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 533 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the magistrate judge's February 20, 2020 order is AFFIRMED. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 6/19/2020. (RJE)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 521 ORDER granting in part 491 Motion to Compel (see order for details); deferring ruling on 491 Motion to Compel in part and requiring parties to meet and confer, and if no agreement is reached, to file supplemental letter briefs (see order for details). (Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 4/22/2020. (BJP)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 2/3/2020. (RJE)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 414 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 345 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings(Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 10/28/2019. (LCC)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER: granting 330 Joint Motion Regarding Continued Sealing; denying 338 Joint Motion Regarding Continued Sealing. Permanent Sealing GRANTED for Document Number(s): 295, 297.Document Number(s) to be UNSEALED: 302, 311-324, 326. Order on continued sealing becomes final on 7/22/2019 unless further timely submissions are filed.(Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 6/24/2019. (BJP)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER granting 214 Motion to Lift Stay(Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 3/6/2019. (BJP)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting 152 Joint Motion Regarding Continued Sealing. Permanent Sealing GRANTED for Document Number(s): 147, 149.Document Number(s) to be UNSEALED: 145. Order on continued sealing becomes final on 11/13/2018 unless further timely submissions are filed.(Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 10/16/2018. (LCC)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER denying 109 Motion to Lift Stay; 115 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings deemed withdrawn without prejudice. (Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 10/4/2018. (BJP)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER denying 77 Motion to Lift Stay(Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 4/24/2018. (BJP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willis Electric Co., Ltd. v. Polygroup Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polygroup Limited (Macao Commerical Offshore)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polygroup Macau Limited (BVI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polytree (H.K) Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willis Electric Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Douglas J Christensen
Represented By: Dwight G Rabuse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?