United States of America v. Robbin et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Ronny B Robbin, Lynette R Robbin and North American State Bank
Case Number: 0:2016cv00083
Filed: January 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Stearns
Presiding Judge: Leo I. Brisbois
Presiding Judge: Donovan W. Frank
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER - Defendants' pro se Emergency Motion to Suspend Injunctions Pending Appeal (Doc. No. 87 ) is DENIED.(Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 9/12/2019. (las)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Defendants Ronny and Lynette Robbin's Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment (Doc. No. 69 ) is DENIED. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 10/16/2017. (BJS)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. 1. The Government's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. No. 44 ) is GRANTED. 2. Defendant Robbin's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. No. 50 ) is DENIDED.3. Consistent with this Memorandum Opinion, the Court shall issue an Order of Judgment against Defendant Ronny B. Robbin. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 8/9/2017. (BJS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Robbin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael R Pahl
Represented By: LaQuita Taylor-Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronny B Robbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynette R Robbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American State Bank
Represented By: D Sherwood McKinnis
Represented By: Jacob G Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?