Crossroads Residents Organized for Stable and Secure ResiDencieS (CROSSRDS) et al v. MSP Crossroads Apartments LLC et al
Plaintiff: Crossroads Residents Organized for Stable and Secure ResiDencieS (CROSSRDS), Linda Lee Soderstrom, Maria Johnson, Craig Goodwin, Donna Goodwin, Jurline Bryant, Claire Jean Lee, Viky Martinez-Melgar, Aurora Saenz, Deborah Suminguit, Norma Ziegler, Darlene Fisher, Samuel Graham, Carlos Hines, Kenneth Orr, Bernard Campbell, Lisa Brown, David Moffet, Quaintance Clark, Khadijah Abdul-Malik, Kevin Vaughn, Maria de Lourdes Vargas-Pegueros, Julio Stalin de Tourniel, Rocillo Rodriquez, Sandra Ponce, Kerly Rios, Juan Martinez, Mercedes Melgar, Tamara Ann Bane, Charles Ward, Tressie Neloms, Dorothy Pickett, Sylvia Anderson, Guadalupe Rodriguez Bonilla, Tyrus Johnson, Leticia Barban, Alice Joiner, Beverly Griffin and HOME Line
Defendant: MSP Crossroads Apartments LLC and Soderberg Apartment Specialists
Case Number: 0:2016cv00233
Filed: February 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Hennepin
Presiding Judge: Katherine M. Menendez
Presiding Judge: Ann D. Montgomery
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 206 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 192 FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT, APPROVAL OF NOTICE PLAN, OVERRULING OF OBJECTION [182, 186], APPROVAL OF PLAN OF ALLOCATION AND AUTHORIZATION OF DISTRIBUTION, APPROVAL OF INCENTIVE AWARDS, FEES AND EXPENSES, AND FOR FINAL CLASS CERTIFICATION AND ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 02/02/2018. (TLU)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER overruling [135, 137] Plaintiff Claire Jean Lee's Objections to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez's Second Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order 130 ; overruling 138 Plaintiff Claire Jean Lee's Objection to Judge Menendez's May 8, 2017 Order 132 . The Second Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order 130 and the May 8, 2017 Order 132 are AFFIRMED (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 06/06/2017. (TLU)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Overruling 91 OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION 82 to District Judge, granting counsel's Motion to Withdraw as Individual Counsel for Plaintiff Claire Jean Lee (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 03/13/2017. (TLU)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crossroads Residents Organized for Stable and Secure ResiDencieS (CROSSRDS) et al v. MSP Crossroads Apartments LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSP Crossroads Apartments LLC
Represented By: Donna E Hanbery
Represented By: Christopher T Kalla
Represented By: Bradley J Lindeman
Represented By: Margaret R Ryan
Represented By: Jennifer M Zwilling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soderberg Apartment Specialists
Represented By: Donna E Hanbery
Represented By: Christopher T Kalla
Represented By: Bradley J Lindeman
Represented By: Margaret R Ryan
Represented By: Jennifer M Zwilling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crossroads Residents Organized for Stable and Secure ResiDencieS (CROSSRDS)
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Timothy L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Lee Soderstrom
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Timothy L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Johnson
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Timothy L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Goodwin
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Timothy L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Goodwin
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Timothy L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jurline Bryant
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Timothy L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claire Jean Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viky Martinez-Melgar
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Timothy L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aurora Saenz
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Timothy L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Suminguit
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Timothy L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Ziegler
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Timothy L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Fisher
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Timothy L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Graham
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Timothy L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Hines
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Timothy L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Orr
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Timothy L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Campbell
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Timothy L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Brown
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Timothy L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Moffet
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Timothy L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quaintance Clark
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Timothy L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khadijah Abdul-Malik
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Timothy L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Vaughn
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Timothy L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria de Lourdes Vargas-Pegueros
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Timothy L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Stalin de Tourniel
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Timothy L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocillo Rodriquez
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Timothy L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Ponce
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Timothy L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerly Rios
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Timothy L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Martinez
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Timothy L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercedes Melgar
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Timothy L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Ann Bane
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Timothy L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Ward
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Timothy L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tressie Neloms
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Timothy L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Pickett
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Timothy L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Anderson
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Timothy L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Rodriguez Bonilla
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Timothy L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrus Johnson
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Timothy L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leticia Barban
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Timothy L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Joiner
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Timothy L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Griffin
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Timothy L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOME Line
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: Timothy L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?