United States of America v. Mooney et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: William J. Mooney, Joni T. Mooney and Harbor Holdings, Mid-Atlantic Trustees and Administrators
Counter_claimant: Joni T. Mooney and William J. Mooney
Counter_defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 0:2016cv02547
Filed: July 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Morrison
Presiding Judge: Leo I. Brisbois
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER authorizing sale of property. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 2/6/2019. (MJC)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER denying 157 Motion to Dismiss/General; denying 157 Motion to Vacate Order; Adopt 166 Report and Recommendation.(Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 11/1/2018. (KML)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 119 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting 146 Report and Recommendation. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 5/15/2018. (SMD)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER adopting 112 Report and Recommendation; denying 83 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 2/15/2018. (SMD)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER denying 51 Motion to Dismiss/General; adopting 74 Report and Recommendation. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 05/31/2017. (SMD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Mooney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael R Pahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J. Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joni T. Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Holdings, Mid-Atlantic Trustees and Administrators
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Joni T. Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: William J. Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Michael R Pahl
Represented By: Michael R Pahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?