Beaulieu v. Stockwell et al
Plaintiff: Allen Beaulieu
Defendant: Clint Stockwell, Does, Thomas Martin Crouse, Charles Willard Sanvik and Studio 1124, LLC
Case Number: 0:2016cv03586
Filed: October 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Hennepin
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Presiding Judge: Donovan W. Frank
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 285 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Charles Willard "Chuck" Sanvik's Motion forAttorney Fees (Doc. No. 243 ) is DENIED. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 8/21/2019. (las)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 279 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - Plaintiff Allen Beaulieu's Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b), Motion to Certify Interlocutory Appeal/ Motion for Entry of Partial Final Judgment, or in the alterative, to Certify Issues for Interlocutory Appeal (Doc. No. 263 ) is DENIED. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 6/14/2019. (las)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 241 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - Plaintiff Allen Beaulieu's Objection to Costs (Doc. No. 238 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as set forth above. Defendant Charles Willard Sanvik's Cost Judgment (Doc. No. 240 ) shall be amended by the clerk's office to reflect a reduction of $3,145.26 the costs associated with video recording. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 2/19/2019. (las) Modified text on 2/19/2019 (las).
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 232 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: With respect to Defendants Thomas Martin Crouse and Studio 1124, LLC, Sua Sponte Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 47 ) as alleged against all remaining defendants is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Court exercises its discretion to retain jurisdiction over Defendants' state law counterclaims. The Court respectfully directs the parties to contact Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer for the purpose of establishing a settlement-mediation conference to discuss Defendants' counterclaims. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 1/2/2019. (las)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 220 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Defendant Charles Willard "Chuck" Sanvik's Motion to for Summary Judgment (Doc. No. 164 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 47 ) as alleged against Defendant Charles Willard "Chuck" Sanvik's is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 12/7/2018. (las)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - Defendant Charles Sanvik's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 54 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as outlined below: 1. Consistent with the Court's Memorandum Opinion, the Court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDI CE Plaintiff's claim in the Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 47 ) for tortious interference with a prospective economic advantage against Defendant Sanvik. The Court grants Plaintiff leave to amend his complaint with respect to this claim. 2. The remainder of Defendant Sanvik's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 2/14/2018. (las)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beaulieu v. Stockwell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Beaulieu
Represented By: Alexander Farrell
Represented By: Russell M Spence, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clint Stockwell
Represented By: John R Beattie
Represented By: Kevin D Hofman
Represented By: George R Serdar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Martin Crouse
Represented By: Michael M Sawers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Willard Sanvik
Represented By: John R Beattie
Represented By: Kevin D Hofman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Studio 1124, LLC
Represented By: John R Beattie
Represented By: Kevin D Hofman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?