Kerkhoff Cattle Co., Inc. v. Sioux City Truck Sales, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kerkhoff Cattle Co., Inc.
Defendant: Sioux City Truck Sales, Inc, PACCAR, Inc. and Sioux City Truck Sales, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2017cv00474
Filed: February 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Redwood
Presiding Judge: Steven E Rau
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2017 Filing 17 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(kt)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on April 28, 2017. (HAZ)
April 27, 2017 Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE of CANCELLATION of Hearing: #12 ORDER/NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 5/1/2017 01:00 PM is CANCELED. (MME)
April 26, 2017 Filing 14 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Kerkhoff Cattle Co., Inc. . (Stroup, Kevin)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/1/2017. Discovery due by 11/15/2017. Motions (non-disp) due 12/15/2017. Motions (disp) due by 1/15/2018. Ready for trial due by 4/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 3/30/2017. (KNK)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER/NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 5/1/2017 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 3/30/2017. (KNK)
March 24, 2017 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/24/2017. Order to issue. (LPH)
March 24, 2017 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant PACCAR, Inc. (Sater, Jesse) Modified on 3/27/2017 (MMP).
March 24, 2017 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Kerkhoff Cattle Co., Inc. (Stroup, Kevin) Modified on 3/27/2017 (MMP).
March 22, 2017 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Sioux City Truck Sales, Inc.. (Brehm, Scott)
March 13, 2017 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by PACCAR, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Kerkhoff Cattle Co., Inc. and Sioux City Truck Sales, Inc..(Sater, Jesse)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER/NOTICE OF PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 3/27/2017 09:00 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 348 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 2/28/17. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(LPH)
February 22, 2017 Filing 5 Separate ANSWER to Complaint by Sioux City Truck Sales, Inc.. (Brehm, Scott)
February 15, 2017 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil Master List and referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 17-cv-474 (JRT/SER). (lmb)
February 15, 2017 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by PACCAR Inc. (Lutz, David) Modified text/filer on 2/15/2017 (lmb).
February 15, 2017 Filing 2 EXHIBITS: Summons and Complaint from State Court re #1 Notice of Removal by PACCAR Inc. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Lutz, David) Modified text on 2/15/2017 (lmb).
February 15, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Civil Action from Redwood County, case number N/A. (Filing fee $400 receipt number AMNDC-5341606.) Filed by PACCAR, Inc. No summons requested. (Lutz, David) Modified text on 2/15/2017 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kerkhoff Cattle Co., Inc. v. Sioux City Truck Sales, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerkhoff Cattle Co., Inc.
Represented By: Kevin K Stroup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sioux City Truck Sales, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACCAR, Inc.
Represented By: Jesse E Sater
Represented By: David N Lutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sioux City Truck Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Scott A Brehm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?